Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1941414

EP1941414 - SELECTION OF GENOTYPED TRANSFUSION DONORS BY CROSS-MATCHING TO GENOTYPED RECIPIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioArray Solutions Ltd.
35 Technology Drive, Suite 100
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
[2008/28]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yi
3024 REVERE COURT Hillsborough
NJ 08844 / US
02 / SEUL, Michael
84 PLEASANT AVENUE Fanwood
NJ 07023 / US
 [2008/28]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/17]Taormino, Joseph Paul , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2010/02]Maggs, Michael Norman , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2008/28]Maggs, Michael Norman , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06826464.723.10.2006
[2008/28]
WO2006US41281
Priority number, dateUS20050729637P24.10.2005         Original published format: US 729637 P
[2008/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007050511
Date:03.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1941414
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007
[2008/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2008/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/28]
TitleGerman:AUSWAHL VON GENOTYPISIERTEN TRANSFUSIONSSPENDERN DURCH KREUZVERGLEICH MIT GENOTYPISIERTEN EMPFÄNGERN[2008/28]
English:SELECTION OF GENOTYPED TRANSFUSION DONORS BY CROSS-MATCHING TO GENOTYPED RECIPIENTS[2008/28]
French:SELECTION DE DONNEURS DE TRANSFUSION GENOTYPES PAR EPREUVE DE COMPATIBILITE CROISEE AVEC DES RECEVEURS GENOTYPES[2008/28]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2008National basic fee paid 
28.03.2008Search fee paid 
28.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/28]
10.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2011Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/35]
29.06.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.05.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/35]
Appeal following examination29.08.2011Appeal received No.  T2417/11
09.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
21.05.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
21.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  - LAU F.Y. ET AL, "Provision of phenotype-matched blood units: no need for pre-transfusion antibody screening", HAEMATOLOGICA, (200107), vol. 86, no. 7, pages 742 - 748, XP007911260 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 742 - page 743 * * page 745 *
 [X]  - AMBRUSO D.R. ET AL, "Experience with donors matched for minor blood group antigens in patients with sickle cell anemia who are receiving chronic transfusion therapy", TRANSFUSION, (1987), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 94 - 98, XP007911261 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 94 - page 95 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1537-2995.1987.27187121485.x
 [A]  - WORKING PARTY OF THE BCSH, "Guidelines for compatibility procedures in blood transfusion laboratories", TRANSFUSION MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 14, pages 59 - 73, XP007911264 [A] 1-10 * page 59 * * table 1 * * page 67 - page 71 *
 [A]  - SIMON R., "Application of optimization methods to the hematological support of patients with disseminated malignancies", MATHEMATICAL BIOSCIENCES, (1975), vol. 25, pages 125 - 138, XP007911262 [A] 1-10 * page 125 - page 126 * * page 135 - page 136 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0025-5564(75)90056-5
International search[Y]US2005143928  (MOSER ET. AL.);
 [A]US2003154108  (FLETCHER-HAYNES ET AL.);
 [Y]  - HASHMI ET AL., "A flexible array format for large-scale, rapid blood group DNA typing", TRANSFUSION, (200505), XP002493199

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1537-2995.2005.04362.x
 [A]  - SHAM, P. ET AL., "Haplotype Association Analysis of Discrete and Continuous Traits Using Mixture of Regression Models", BEHAVIOR GENETICS, vol. 34, no. 2, (200403), pages 207 - 214, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/1755482557mq4308, (20071113), XP008127233