blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1961176 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1961176



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 257
30.01.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.02.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
13.02.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
13.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
21.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
21.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.10.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.05.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
20.05.2009 Description Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Description Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
22.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
30.07.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.06.2008 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
18.06.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
05.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
25.04.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.03.2008 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.03.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.03.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.03.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.10.2007 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
27.09.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.09.2007 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.09.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
17.09.2007 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
17.09.2007 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
11.07.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
21.06.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.06.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35
11.12.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
11.12.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 6
11.12.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 23
11.12.2006 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5