blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1961176


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
03.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.07.2016  [2016/27]
16.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.11.2015  [2015/47]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
30.01.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
10.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
05.09.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
29.08.2014 Change - representative published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
08.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
01.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
16.05.2014 Change - applicant published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
28.02.2014 Change - representative published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
21.02.2014 (Expected) grant published on  26.03.2014  [2014/13]
17.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
03.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.12.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.09.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.09.2010 Change - representative published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]
06.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.01.2009 First examination report
21.01.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.01.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2008 Change - representative published on  05.11.2008  [2008/45]
25.07.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
25.07.2008 Request for examination filed published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
08.07.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
25.10.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2007 PCT data prior to European publication