Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1961176

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 26.03.2014
 BELapse: 26.03.2014
 BGLapse: 26.06.2014
 CHLapse: 31.12.2014
CYLapse: 26.03.2014
 CZLapse: 26.03.2014
 DE 
 DKLapse: 26.03.2014
 EELapse: 26.03.2014
 ES 
 FILapse: 26.03.2014
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 27.06.2014
 HULapse: 08.12.2006
 IELapse: 08.12.2014
 ISLapse: 26.07.2014
 IT 
 LILapse: 31.12.2014
 LTLapse: 26.03.2014
 LULapse: 08.12.2014
LVLapse: 26.03.2014
 MCLapse: 26.03.2014
 NLLapse: 26.03.2014
 PLLapse: 26.03.2014
 PTLapse: 28.07.2014
 ROLapse: 26.03.2014
 SE 
 SILapse: 26.03.2014
 SKLapse: 26.03.2014
 TRLapse: 26.03.2014
Examination procedure13.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase05.06.2008National basic fee paid 
05.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted26.03.2014
Opposition procedure06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.03.2015 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.08.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080605
 
Event date:27.08.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:25.02.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090122
 
Event date:01.08.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:04.12.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20131105
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 659456 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20140415
 
Event date:07.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20140508
 
Event date:18.06.2014 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
OWNER NAME:OPTIS WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY, LLC
 
Event date:24.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE
 
Event date:08.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:09.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2474792 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20140709
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE
Effective DATE:20140624
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:OPTIS WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY, LLC, PLANO, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL), STOCKHOLM, SE
Effective DATE:20140618
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE
Effective DATE:20140624
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE
Effective DATE:20140624
 
Event date:15.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 659456 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:25.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:27.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140731 AND 20140806
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:30.09.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140726
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140626
 
Event date:04.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE
 
Event date:04.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.12.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140728
 
Event date:06.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20150106
 
Event date:09.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20150106
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141208
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141231
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141231
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141208
 
Event date:17.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:30.06.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140627
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20140326
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20061208
 
Event date:21.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151208
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Effective DATE:20170710
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151208
 
Event date:21.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20171121
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20171120
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20171120
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20171123
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20171121
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180103
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:02.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 602006040859 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:30.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20181209
 
Event date:28.08.2019 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20181208
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20181231
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20190702
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20181208