Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1961176

EP1961176 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE-NOISE COMPENSATION IN DIGITAL RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optis Wireless Technology, LLC
P.O. Box 250649
Plano, TX 75025 / US
[2014/25]
Former [2014/13]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
Patent Unit
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
Patent Unit
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WALLEN, Anders
Norregatan 45 B
S-241 33 Eslöv / SE
02 / WILHELMSSON, Leif
Lyftvägen 5
S-240 10 Dalby / SE
 [2008/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2014/14]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/13]Akerman, Mårten Lennart , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet
221 83 Lund / SE
Former [2010/40]Akerman, Marten Lennart , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms Nya Vattentornet
221 83 Lund / SE
Former [2008/45]Bratt, Hanna Catharina , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
Former [2008/35]Onshage, Anders Christer , et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date06829438.808.12.2006
[2008/35]
WO2006EP11838
Priority number, dateUS2005030110012.12.2005         Original published format: US 301100
[2008/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007068407
Date:21.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1961176
Date:27.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007
[2008/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1961176
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/227, H04L27/233, H04L27/00
[2008/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMPENSATION VON PHASENRAUSCHEN IN DIGITALEMPFÄNGERN[2008/35]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE-NOISE COMPENSATION IN DIGITAL RECEIVERS[2008/35]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE COMPENSATION DE BRUIT DE PHASE DANS DES RÉCEPTEURS NUMÉRIQUES[2008/35]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2008National basic fee paid 
05.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/35]
22.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2014Fee for grant paid
13.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2009
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.12.2006
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE08.12.2014
LU08.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE08.12.2014
LU08.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE08.12.2014
LU08.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE08.12.2014
LU08.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
IE08.12.2014
LU08.12.2014
Former [2015/36]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU08.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU08.12.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
Former [2014/47]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
Former [2014/46]BE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
Former [2014/41]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
Former [2014/37]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004004268  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; SMIT GERRIT [NL]) [X] 1-6,9-17,20-22 * abstract * * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 3 * * page 4, line 16 - line 23 * * page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 2 *;
 [X]EP0316842  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,11-17,20,22 * column 1, line 4 - line 5 * * column 4, line 6 - line 32 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 24 * * figure 5 *;
 [XA]  - MUTSUMU SERIZAWA ET AL, "PHASE-TRACKING VITERBI DEMODULATOR", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (199601), vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 82 - 96, XP000553793 [X] 1-6,9,11-17,20,22 * Summary 2.3 Conventional coherent detection and problems 2.4 Coherent detector for low SNR * [A] 7,8,18,19
 [X]  - WENZHEN LI ET AL, "A new receiver architecture for joint carrier, channel, and data estimation for high-rate WPAN systems", VTC 2002-FALL. 2002 IEEE 56TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. VANCOUVER, CANADA, SEPT. 24 - 28, 2002, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020924), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 56, ISBN 0-7803-7467-3, pages 1637 - 1641, XP010608706 [X] 1-6,9-17,20-22 * I. Introduction II.B. System model description III.B. Integration of MLSE and PLL Fig. 2, 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2002.1040493
by applicant   - "PHASE-TRACKING VITERBI DEMODULATOR", MUTSUMU SERIZAWA ET AL., ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART 1- COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY, (199601), vol. 79, pages 82 - 96