Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1962877 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1962877



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 289
27.05.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.08.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.06.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.06.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.06.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
12.06.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.02.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.02.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.02.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 9
14.02.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 9
09.01.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.12.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 12
19.12.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 12
19.12.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.11.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
31.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.10.2018 Authorisation Appeal 3
25.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
24.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.08.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.12.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
02.12.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.11.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.10.2014 Claims Appeal 2
30.10.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
29.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.10.2014 Claims Appeal 2
29.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
20.08.2014 Notice of appeal/statement of grounds Appeal 3
19.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.08.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.07.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
30.05.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.05.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
27.05.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
28.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
28.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
06.02.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.01.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.08.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 General enquiry Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
28.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.06.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.06.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.08.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
06.08.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.07.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 17
18.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
18.06.2008 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
07.05.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.09.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
13.09.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
28.06.2007 Published international application - A2 Search / examination 9
15.12.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
15.12.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 1
15.12.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 7