Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1951227

EP1951227 - USE OF PIMOBENDAN FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASYMPTOMATIC (OCCULT) HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/32]USE OF PDE III INHIBITORS OR CALCIUM SENSITIZERS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASYMPTOMATIC (OCCULT) HEART FAILURE
[2016/46]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[2008/32]
Inventor(s)01 / KLEEMANN, Rainer
Jenaer Strasse 15
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
02 / TROETSCHEL, Christian
Untere Amalienhoehe 12
55425 Waldalgesheim / DE
03 / VOLLMAR, Andrea
Heisterstr. 5
57537 Wissen / DE
 [2008/32]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]Simon, Elke Anna Maria , et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2009/48]Hammann, Heinz , et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD-Patents Binger Straße 173
55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Former [2008/32]Hammann, Heinz , et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE
Application number, filing date06829958.508.11.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006EP68231
Priority number, dateEP2005011068914.11.2005         Original published format: EP 05110689
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007054514
Date:18.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1951227
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1951227
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4166, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444, A61K31/50, A61K31/501, A61P9/04
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2008/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON PIMOBENDAN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASYMPTOMATISCHER (OKKULTER) HERZINSUFFIZIENZ[2016/46]
English:USE OF PIMOBENDAN FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASYMPTOMATIC (OCCULT) HEART FAILURE[2016/46]
French:UTILISATION DU PIMOBENDANE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE ASYMPTOMATIQUE (OCCULTE)[2016/46]
Former [2008/32]VERWENDUNG VON PDE-III-HEMMERN ODER CALCIUM-SENSIBILISATOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASYMPTOMATISCHER (OKKULTER) HERZINSUFFIZIENZ
Former [2008/32]USE OF PDE III INHIBITORS OR CALCIUM SENSITIZERS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASYMPTOMATIC (OCCULT) HEART FAILURE
Former [2008/32]UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA PDE III POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE ASYMPTOMATIQUE (OCCULTE)
Entry into regional phase16.06.2008National basic fee paid 
16.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
25.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2016Observations by third parties
17.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2017Fee for grant paid
03.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.03.2017Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP17165100.3  / EP3210605
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.01.2018   
VIRBAC
1ère Avenue, 2065m, L.I.D.
06516 Carros / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3 Cours du Triangle
CS 80165
92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  12.01.2018   
VIRBAC
1ère Avenue, 2065m, L.I.D.
06516 Carros / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
24.01.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.06.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.02.2019Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/31]
18.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
LU08.11.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2018/41]EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
LU08.11.2017
Former [2018/33]EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]FI12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
IS12.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1579862  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [DE]) [X] 1,3-9 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * claims 1-5,12-14 *;
 [X]WO03012030  (UNIV UTAH TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * page 64, paragraph 4 - page 65, paragraph 2 * * claim 25 *;
 [A]  - DENEKE T ET AL, "Medical therapy for chronic heart failure", HERZSCHRITTMACHERTHERAPIE UND ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGIE 2004 GERMANY, (2004), vol. 15, no. SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0938-7412, pages I/74 - I/80, XP002422088 [A] 1-9 * page I/78, figure 1 *
 [A]  - O'GRADY M R ET AL, "Does angiotensin converting enzyme inhibitor therapy delay the onset of congestive heart failure or sudden death in Doberman Pinschers with occult dilated cardiomyopathy?", JOURNAL OF VETERINARY INTERNAL MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 11, page 138 (ABSTRACT), XP009079649 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1579862
 WO03012030
 EP0008391
 GB2228004
 US5151420
 US5569657
    - Reminqton's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY
OppositionWO2005092343
 EP1579862
 WO03012030
 US5151420
 US4361563
 US4868182
    - "vet", PETIT et al., Dictionnaire des médicaments vétérinaires et des produits de santé animale commercialisés en France, (20050300), pages 1256 - 1257, XP055452751
    - FUENTES et al., "A DOUBLE-BLIND, RANDOMIZED, PLACEBO-CONTROLLED STUDY OF PIMOBENDAN IN DOGS WITH DILATED CARDIOMYOPATHY", Journal of Veterinary Internal Medicin, (20020000), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 255 - 261, XP009079613

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1892/0891-6640(2002)016<0255:ADRPSO>2.3.CO;2
    - O'GRADY et al., "ACVIM ABSTACTS", Journal of Veterinary Internal Medicin, (19970000), vol. 11, page 138, XP055452759
    - DENEKE et al., "Medikamentoese therapie der Herzinsuffizienz", Herzschr. Elektrophys., (20040000), vol. 15, pages 74 - 80, XP002422088
    - SUMMERFIELD et al., "Efficacy of Pimobendan in the Prevention of Congestive HeartFailure or Sudden Death in Doberman Pinschers with PreclinicalDilated Cardiomyopathy (The PROTECT Study)", Journal of Veterinary Internal Medicin, (20120000), vol. 26, pages 1337 - 1349, XP055452761
    - R. WOOLLEY et al., "Effects of Treatment Type on Vertebral Heart Size in Dogs With Myxomatous Mitral Valve Disease", Intern J Appl Res Med, (20070000), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 43 - 48, XP055310428
    - "NADA 141-273,", Freedom of Information Summary, (20070430), pages 1 - 33, XP055452777
    - A. FITTON et al., "Pimobendan. A review of its pharmacology and therapeutic potential in congestiveheart failure", Drugs and Aging, (19940000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 417 - 441, XP003031489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00002512-199404050-00007
    - P. JAIN et al., "Effects of milrinone on left ventricular remodeling after acute myocardial infarction", Circulation, (19910802), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 796 - 804, XP055075397

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.84.2.796
    - "VET", Dictionnaire des Médicaments Vétérinaires, (20030000), pages 1229 - 1230, XP055452787
    - J. A. MCCROHON et al., "Differentiation of Heart Failure Related to DilatedCardiomyopathy and Coronary Artery Disease UsingGadolinium-Enhanced Cardiovascular Magnetic Resonance", Circulation, (20030000), vol. 108, pages 54 - 59, XP055452793
    - CHETBOUL et al., "Comparative Adverse Cardiac Effects of Pimobendan and Benazepril Monotherapy in Dogs with Mild Degenerative Mitral Valve Disease: A Prospective, Controlled, Blinded, and Randomized Study", Journal of Veterinary Internal Medicin, (20070000), vol. 21, pages 742 - 753, XP055374506

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1939-1676.2007.tb03016.x
    - CHIANG et al., "Management of Congestive Heart Disease", Medical Session, (20020000), vol. 7, no. 8, pages 4 - 9, XP055452811
    - Representation schématique de ces différentes questions et motifs d'invalidité