Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1960521

EP1960521 - METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR THE SEPARATION, PURIFICATION AND RECOVERY OF LONG- AND SHORT-CHAIN NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AJ Innuscreen GmbH
Robert-Roessle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
[2008/35]
Inventor(s)01 / HILLEBRAND, Timo
Bogenstrasse 29
D-15366 Hoenow / DE
 [2011/14]
Former [2008/35]01 / TIMO, Hillebrand
Bogenstrasse 29
D-15366 Hoenow / DE
Representative(s)Wehlan, Martin
Patentanwälte Wehlan & Wehlan
Möllendorffstraße 49
10367 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/38]Wehlan, Helmut
Patentanwälte Wehlan & Wehlan Möllendorffstrasse 49
10367 Berlin / DE
Former [2008/35]Wehlan, Helmut
Patentanwälte Wehlan & Wehlan Möllendorffstrasse 49
10367 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date06830455.907.12.2006
[2008/35]
WO2006EP69451
Priority number, dateDE2005105921707.12.2005         Original published format: DE102005059217
[2008/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007065934
Date:14.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1960521
Date:27.08.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007
[2008/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1960521
Date:21.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10
[2008/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND TESTKIT ZUR TRENNUNG, AUFREINIGUNG UND WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON LANG- UND KURZKETTIGEN NUKLEINSÄUREN[2008/35]
English:METHOD AND TEST KIT FOR THE SEPARATION, PURIFICATION AND RECOVERY OF LONG- AND SHORT-CHAIN NUCLEIC ACIDS[2008/35]
French:PROCEDE ET KIT D'ANALYSE POUR LA SEPARATION, LA PURIFICATION ET LA RECUPERATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES A CHAINE LONGUE ET A CHAINE COURTE[2011/14]
Former [2008/35]PROCEDE ET KIT D ANALYSE POUR LA SEPARATION, LA PURIFICATION ET LA RECUPERATION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES A CHAINE LONGUE ET A CHAINE COURTE
Entry into regional phase04.07.2008National basic fee paid 
04.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/35]
18.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2011Fee for grant paid
20.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Qiagen GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Qiagen GmbH
Qiagen Str. 1
40724 Hilden / DE
Opponent's representative
Roth, Carla
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.10.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition29.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0003/15
02.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
07.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
31.01.2011Request for further processing filed
31.01.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.02.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
[2015/34]
Former [2015/08]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
DE01.07.2014
Former [2013/45]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2013/44]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2013/29]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/20]CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
IE21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/12]CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/11]FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
Former [2012/08]LT21.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2004042058  (INVITEK BIOTECHNIK & BIODESIGN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * page 5, line 14 - line 16; claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO0204620  (QIAGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]WO9954340  (PROMEGA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * page 16, line 14 - line 23; claims 9,11 *;
 [A]WO0034463  (INVITEK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,5 *;
 [A]WO2004055207  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 8 - line 13 *;
 [DA]WO8908257  (PORATH JERKER [SE], et al) [DA] 1-15 * page 5, line 5 - line 8 *;
 [Y]  - EON-DUVAL ALEX ET AL, "Precipitation of RNA impurities with high salt in a plasmid DNA purification process: Use of experimental design to determine reaction conditions.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20030905), vol. 83, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 544 - 553, XP002422884 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 545, column L, line 8 - line 10 * * page 545, column R, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10704
 [A]  - FARRAH S R, "Chemical factors influencing adsorption of bacteriophage MS2 to membrane filters.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY MAR 1982, (198203), vol. 43, no. 3, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 659 - 663, XP002422885 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LAKSHMI S ET AL, "STUDIES ON THE CHAOTROPICALLY SOLUBILIZED ARYL SULFATASE C EC-3.1.6.1 AND ESTRONE SULFATASE OF SHEEP BRAIN", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1979), vol. 567, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 184 - 195, XP002422886 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2005058933
 DE19746874