Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962781

EP1962781 - Transparent sunscreen agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/36]TRANSPARENT SUNSCREEN AGENTS
[2014/10]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastraße 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
[2014/20]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LERG, Heike
Glindweg 15
22303 Hamburg / DE
02 / MUNDT, Claudia
Holunderstrasse 89 A
28207 Bremen / DE
03 / SUGÁR, Martin
Rellinger Strasse 6
20257 Hamburg / DE
04 / SKUBSCH, Kerstin
Hermanstrasse 30
25421 Pinneberg / DE
05 / TESCH, Mirko
Geibelstrasse 44
22303 Hamburg / DE
06 / WINDISCH, Björna
Lenbachstrasse 2
22607 Hamburg / DE
 [2008/40]
Former [2008/36]01 / LERG, Heike
Glindweg 15
22303 Hamburg / DE
02 / MUNDT, Claudia
Holunderstrasse 89 A
28207 Bremen / DE
03 / SUGÁR, Martin
Rellinger Strasse 6
20257 Hamburg / DE
04 / SKUBSCH, Kerstin
Hermanstrasse 30
25421 Pinneberg / DE
05 / TESCH, Mirko
Geibelstrasse 44
22303 Hamburg / DE
06 / WINDISCH, Björna
Beseler Strasse 15 A
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date06830556.412.12.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006EP69608
Priority number, dateDE2005105974213.12.2005         Original published format: DE102005059742
[2008/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007068699
Date:21.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1962781
Date:03.09.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962781
Date:14.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/35, A61K8/37, A61K8/49, A61Q17/04, A61K8/02, A61K8/34, A61K8/40
[2014/10]
Former International [2008/36]A61K8/35, A61K8/37, A61K8/49, A61Q17/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Transparentes Sonnenschutzmittel[2014/10]
English:Transparent sunscreen agents[2014/10]
French:Produit de protection solaire transparent[2014/10]
Former [2008/36]TRANSPARENTES SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL
Former [2008/36]TRANSPARENT SUNSCREEN AGENTS
Former [2008/36]PRODUIT DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE TRANSPARENT
Entry into regional phase14.07.2008National basic fee paid 
14.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
12.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2014Fee for grant paid
01.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH
Immermannstraße 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
L'Oreal
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
 [2019/34]
Former [2019/27]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
L'Oreal
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2019/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Guillaume, Geneviève
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2017/33]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Guillaume, Geneviève
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2016/03]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann & Vingtoft a/s
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Im Herstel 20
55218 Ingelheim / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2015/13]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015  13.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kreis, Manfred
Tannenstraße 5
55576 Zotzenheim / DE
 02  12.02.2015  17.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Stada-Arzneimittel Aktiengesellschaft
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
 04  13.02.2015  18.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal
D.I.P.I.
25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2015   
Kreis, Manfred
Tannenstraße 5
D-55576 Zotzenheim / DE
18.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
08.08.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.01.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0493/17
21.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2006
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
AT12.12.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IT12.12.2016
[2017/51]
Former [2016/32]HU12.12.2006
BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
TR14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
AT12.12.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
MC14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
AT12.12.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/25]BG14.05.2014
CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
AT12.12.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
IE12.12.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/36]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SI14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
LU12.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
NL14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
RO14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY14.05.2014
CZ14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
EE14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
SK14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY14.05.2014
DK14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
PT15.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
LV14.05.2014
PL14.05.2014
SE14.05.2014
GR15.08.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY14.05.2014
FI14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
IS14.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY14.05.2014
LT14.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY14.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10327468  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * examples 3,4,6-8; claim - *;
 [X]EP0812586  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1-14 * example 2 *;
 [X]EP1586306  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0076] , [0058]; example - *;
 [X]EP1579847  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0093]; example - *;
 [X]WO03053393  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 12, lines 4,5; example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2005107693  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 11-13; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE102004009154  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *
by applicantEP0812586
 US2002172646
 US5204090
 WO9525544
 US5888520
 WO9843673
 WO2004052353
 WO0141727
 EP0412705
 US4671955
 WO03086342
 WO0143722
 WO0047628
 WO2005069822
 DE10327468
 EP1586306
 EP1579847
 WO03053393
OppositionWO9111989
    - fiche Matière premiere SDA40-2 d'Equistar
    - Title27; Chapter I; Subchapter A; Part 21 de Electronic Code of Federal Regulations, pages 28 - 30 et page 44, URL: http://www.ecfrgov/cgi-bin/text
    - International journal of cosmetic Science, (20010000), vol. 23, pages 153 - 160