Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2088097

EP2088097 - STORAGE SYSTEM AND STORAGE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirata Corporation
9-20, Togoshi 3-chome, Shinagawa-Ku
Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
[2009/33]
Inventor(s)01 / WADA, Ryoichi
HIRATA CORPORATION
9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
02 / ISAKA, Issei
HIRATA CORPORATION
9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
03 / KATAYANAGI, Kunio
HIRATA CORPORATION
9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
 [2013/14]
Former [2009/33]01 / WADA, Ryoichi
HIRATA CORPORATION 9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
02 / ISAKA, Issei
HIRATA CORPORATION 9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
03 / KATAYANAGI, Kunio
HIRATA CORPORATION 9-20, Togoshi 3-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP
Representative(s)Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]Kalkoff & Partner
Patentanwälte
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
Former [2009/33]Wenzel & Kalkoff
Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
Application number, filing date06832734.516.11.2006
[2009/33]
WO2006JP322845
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008059573
Date:22.05.2008
Language:JA
[2008/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2088097
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2088097
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.05.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/137, B65G1/04
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
TitleGerman:LAGERSYSTEM UND LAGERVERFAHREN[2009/33]
English:STORAGE SYSTEM AND STORAGE METHOD[2009/33]
French:SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE[2009/33]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2009Translation filed 
15.06.2009National basic fee paid 
15.06.2009Search fee paid 
15.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
16.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
24.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2013Fee for grant paid
15.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2012
Opposition(s)06.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.11.2006
AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
GB16.11.2013
IE16.11.2013
LU16.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
GB16.11.2013
IE16.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/51]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
GB16.11.2013
IE16.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
IE16.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
IT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT03.04.2013
BE03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
GR04.07.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
ES14.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI03.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2787771  (HIRATA SPINNING [JP]) [X] 1 * pages 1-49; figures 1-23 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US6579053  (GRAMS ROBERT S [US] ET AL) [Y] 5 * columns 1-14; figures 1-24 *;
 [A]DE10152048  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [A] 1,12 * columns 1-8; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]EP1489026  (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,12 * columns 1-5; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1059246  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12 * columns 1-21; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US4993906  (NISIMURA SEIICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,12 * columns 1-8; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3913312  (SCHLIMM NORBERT [DE]; BENCAK BRANKO [DE]; SEIDL ALOIS [DE]) [A] 1,12 * columns 1-3; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2001293  (LIPPERT MASCH STAHLBAU J) [A] 1,12 * pages 1-5; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2004129150  (LANCASTER PATRICK R [US] ET AL) [A] 1,12 * pages 1-19; figures 1-11 *