Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1956373

EP1956373 - METHOD FOR ASSAYING ANTI-TREPONEMA PALLIDUM ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/33]REAGENT FOR ASSAYING ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID ANTIBODY AND REAGENT FOR ASSAYING ANTI-TREPONEMA PALLIDUM ANTIBODY
[2016/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 04.04.2018  [2018/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sekisui Medical Co., Ltd.
13-5, Nihombashi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
For all designated states
NOF Corporation
20-3 Yebisu Garden Place Tower Ebisu 4-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-6019 / JP
[2008/33]
Inventor(s)01 / AKAMINE, Takayuki
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho
Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
02 / OTA, Tetsuya
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho
Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
03 / LI, Yan
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho
Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
 [2017/04]
Former [2008/33]01 / AKAMINE, Takayuki
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
02 / OTA, Tetsuya
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
03 / LI, Yan
c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-1, Hyakuyama, Shimamotocho Mishima-gun
Osaka 618-8589 / JP
Representative(s)Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2017/04]
Former [2008/33]Hart-Davis, Jason , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date06834228.607.12.2006
[2008/33]
WO2006JP324473
Priority number, dateJP2005035408007.12.2005         Original published format: JP 2005354080
JP2005035408107.12.2005         Original published format: JP 2005354081
[2008/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007066731
Date:14.06.2007
Language:JA
[2007/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1956373
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1956373
Date:25.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.06.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/531, G01N33/545, G01N33/571, G01N33/92
[2008/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/04]
Former [2008/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFHAREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINES ANTIKÖRPERS GEGEN TREPONEMA PALLIDUM[2016/33]
English:METHOD FOR ASSAYING ANTI-TREPONEMA PALLIDUM ANTIBODY[2016/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LE DOSAGE D'ANTICORPS ANTI-TRÉPONÉMA PALLIDUM[2016/33]
Former [2008/33]REAGENS ZUM TESTEN EINES ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID-ANTIKÖRPERS UND REAGENS ZUM TESTEN EINES ANTIKÖRPERS GEGEN TREPONEMA PALLIDUM
Former [2008/33]REAGENT FOR ASSAYING ANTIPHOSPHOLIPID ANTIBODY AND REAGENT FOR ASSAYING ANTI-TREPONEMA PALLIDUM ANTIBODY
Former [2008/33]RÉACTIF POUR LE DOSAGE D'ANTICORPS ANTI-PHOSPHOLIPIDES ET RÉACTIF POUR DOSAGE D'ANTICORPS ANTI-TRÉPONÉMA PALLIDUM
Entry into regional phase17.06.2008Translation filed 
17.06.2008National basic fee paid 
17.06.2008Search fee paid 
17.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/33]
22.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2016Fee for grant paid
13.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2009
Opposition(s)26.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.01.2017
CZ25.01.2017
EE25.01.2017
FI25.01.2017
LT25.01.2017
LV25.01.2017
NL25.01.2017
PL25.01.2017
RO25.01.2017
SE25.01.2017
SI25.01.2017
SK25.01.2017
BG25.04.2017
GR26.04.2017
IS25.05.2017
PT25.05.2017
[2018/14]
Former [2017/49]AT25.01.2017
CZ25.01.2017
EE25.01.2017
FI25.01.2017
LT25.01.2017
LV25.01.2017
NL25.01.2017
PL25.01.2017
RO25.01.2017
SE25.01.2017
SK25.01.2017
BG25.04.2017
GR26.04.2017
IS25.05.2017
PT25.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT25.01.2017
CZ25.01.2017
FI25.01.2017
LT25.01.2017
LV25.01.2017
NL25.01.2017
PL25.01.2017
SE25.01.2017
BG25.04.2017
GR26.04.2017
IS25.05.2017
PT25.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT25.01.2017
FI25.01.2017
LT25.01.2017
LV25.01.2017
NL25.01.2017
PL25.01.2017
SE25.01.2017
BG25.04.2017
GR26.04.2017
IS25.05.2017
PT25.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9110138  (BAXTER DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2004040311  (VIRAMED BIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GOKAY O ET AL, "Synthesis of diagnostic test kits for syphilis with polymeric particles", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE POLYMER EDITION, (200505), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 597 - 610, XP009110342 [X] 1-5 * pages 599-560; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1163/1568562053783704