Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023161

EP2023161 - METHOD FOR MEASURING RADON AND THORON IN AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.12.2012  [2012/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIIGATA UNIVERSITY
8050, Ikarashi ni-nocho
Niigata-shi, Niigata 950-2181 / JP
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / UEMATSU, Kazuyoshi
Faculty of Engineering Niigata University, 80 50 Ikarashi ni-nocho
Niigata-shi Niigata 950-2181 / JP
02 / SATO, Mineo
Faculty of Engineering Niigata University, 80 50 Ikarashi ni-nocho
Niigata-shi Niigata 950-2181 / JP
03 / OTA, Masatoshi
Faculty of Engineering Niigata University, 80 50 Ikarashi ni-nocho
Niigata-shi Niigata 950-2181 / JP
04 / TODA, Kenji
Faculty of Engineering Niigata University, 80 50 Ikarashi ni-nocho
Niigata-shi Niigata 950-2181 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Sundman, Patrik Christoffer
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Sundman, Patrik Christoffer
Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date06834553.713.12.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006JP324798
Priority number, dateJP2006015732106.06.2006         Original published format: JP 2006157321
[2009/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007141895
Date:13.12.2007
Language:JA
[2007/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023161
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/167, G01T1/22, G01T7/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/30]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON RADON UND THORON IN LUFT[2009/07]
English:METHOD FOR MEASURING RADON AND THORON IN AIR[2009/07]
French:METHODE DE MESURE DU RADON ET DU THORON DANS L'AIR[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008Translation filed 
04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
07.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
03.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/52]
09.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201106   M06   Not yet paid