EP1971779 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF LINEAR COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Jae-Yoo Gocheung Jugong Apt. 404-205 Haan-dong, Gwangmyeong Gyeonggi-do, 423-060 / KR | 02 /
SUNG, Ji-Won 379-1 Doksan 2-dong, Geumcheon-gu Seoul, 153-012 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Chel-Woong 327-23, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2012/27] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
YOO, Jae-Yoo Gocheung Jugong Apt. 404-205 Haan-dong, Gwangmyeong Gyeonggi-do, 423-060 / KR | ||
02 /
SUNG, Ji-Won 379-1 Doksan 2-dong, Geumcheon-gu Seoul, 153-012 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Chel-Woong 327-23, Gasang-Dong, Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
YOO, Jae-Yoo Gocheung Jugong Apt. 404-205 Haan-dong, Gwangmyeong Gyeonggi-do, 423-060 / KR | ||
02 /
SUNG, Ji-Won 379-1 Doksan 2-dong, Geumcheon-gu Seoul, 153-012 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Chel-Woong Sindaebang Apt. 101-710 705, Sindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul, 156-010 / KR | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Josef Heinrich Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Schmidt, Josef Heinrich Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Schmidt, Josef Heinrich Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06835542.9 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006KR05842 | Priority number, date | KR20060000677 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060000677 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007078115 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1971779 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1971779 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04, F04B49/06 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
F04B49/06 (KR);
F04B35/04 (KR);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B49/12 (KR);
F04B2201/0206 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0401 (EP,KR,US);
F04B2203/0402 (EP,KR,US);
F04B2207/046 (KR);
F05B2210/14 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | F04B49/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES LINEARVERDICHTERS | [2008/39] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF LINEAR COMPRESSOR | [2008/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN COMPRESSEUR LINEAIRE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 13.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2006 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | ES | 15.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | GB | 28.12.2012 | IE | 28.12.2012 | LU | 28.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
GB | 28.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
LU | 28.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
GB | 28.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
GB | 28.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
ES | 15.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002064464 (HWANG YIN YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-14* paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003026701 (YOO JAE-YOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figures 2,3 * | International search | [A]JPH09126147 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2002188560 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]US6685438 (YOO JAE YOO [KR], et al); | [A]US6851934 (YOO JAE-YOO [KR], et al) |