Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962578

EP1962578 - CLOSTEROVIRUS-RESISTANT MELON PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monsanto Invest N.V.
Handelsweg 53 N
1181 ZA Amstelveen / NL
[2009/52]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
De Ruiter Seeds R&D B.V.
Leeuwenhoekweg 52
2661 CZ Bergschenhoek / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HOFSTEDE, René, Johannes, Maria
Willibrordusstraat 14
NL-6657 BM Boven-Leeuwen / NL
02 / KRAAKMAN, Petrus, Jacobus
Torre Caribe 7D
E-04720 Aguadulce / ES
03 / DE VRIES, Jeroen, Sebastiaan
Papestraat 21B
NL-2513 AV Den Haag / NL
 [2008/36]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]von Menges, Albrecht
Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/36]Hatzmann, Martin
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date06835672.421.12.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006NL00650
Priority number, dateEP2005007795321.12.2005         Original published format: EP 05077953
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007073167
Date:28.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1962578
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962578
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/08, C12Q1/68
[2008/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CLOSTEROVIRUSRESISTENTE MELONENPFLANZEN[2008/36]
English:CLOSTEROVIRUS-RESISTANT MELON PLANTS[2008/36]
French:PLANTES DE MELONS RESISTANTES AUX CLOSTEROVIRUS[2008/36]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2008National basic fee paid 
08.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
31.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2010
10.09.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2011Fee for grant paid
22.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2016Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP10189577.9  / EP2274974
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.02.2012  07.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Nunhems B.V.
Voort 6
6083 AC Nunhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Majer, Dorothea
Nunhems Netherlands B.V.
P.O. Box 4005
6080 AA Haelen / NL
 02  03.02.2012  26.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
 [2013/09]
Former [2012/37]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2012  07.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Nunhems B.V.
Voort 6
6083 AC Nunhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
 02  03.02.2012  26.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
Former [2012/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.02.2012   
Nunhems B.V.
Voort 6
6083 AC Nunhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Majer, Dorothea
Nunhems Netherlands B.V.
P.O. Box 4005
NL-6080 AA Haelen / NL
 02  03.02.2012    ADMISSIBLE
C. Then/R.Tippe et al
Frohschammerstrasse 14
80807 Munich / DE
02.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.10.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1045/16
01.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.11.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/48]
22.03.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
HU22.12.2015
PT21.06.2016
GR07.07.2016
[2017/37]
Former [2017/04]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
IT21.12.2015
HU22.12.2015
PT21.06.2016
GR07.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
HU22.12.2015
PT21.06.2016
GR07.07.2016
Former [2016/47]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
HU22.12.2015
PT21.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
PT21.06.2016
Former [2013/29]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
BG04.08.2011
IS04.09.2011
GB21.12.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
DE03.07.2012
Former [2012/11]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
DK04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
PL04.05.2011
RO04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
SK04.05.2011
IS04.09.2011
Former [2012/09]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
CZ04.05.2011
EE04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
IS04.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT04.05.2011
BE04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
NL04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
IS04.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT04.05.2011
CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
IS04.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
LV04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
SI04.05.2011
IS04.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY04.05.2011
FI04.05.2011
LT04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
Former [2011/48]LT04.05.2011
SE04.05.2011
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1188833  (RUITER SEEDS C V DE [NL]) [Y] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0024906  (IMPERIAL COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0974672  (KEYGENE NV [NL]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [X]  - HAVEY M J ET AL, "Differential transmission of the Cucumis organellar genomes", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (199807), vol. 97, no. 1-2, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 122 - 128, XP002385582 [X] 1-13,18-27 * page 124, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - J.W. SINCLAIR, screening for resistance to cucurbit yellow stunting disorder virus, gummy stem blight, and monosporascus root rot and detection of RAPD markers associated with QTL for soluble solids, sugars, and vitamin C in melon (Cucumis melo L.), PHD-THESIS SUBMITTED TO TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY, (200312), XP002385678 [X] 1-29 * page 5, line 3 - line 6 * * page 7, line 8 - line 10 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph LAST * * page 13 - page 14 * * page 20 * * page 37 - page 45 *
 [DY]  - LOPEZ-SESE A I ET AL, "Resistance to cucurbit yellowing stunting disorder virus (CYSDV) in Cucumis melo L", HORTSCIENCE, (200002), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0018-5345, pages 110 - 113, XP008065374 [DY] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DANIN-POLEG, Y., ET AL., "search for molecular markers associated with resistance to viruses in melon", ACTA HORT., (2000), vol. 510, pages 399 - 403, XP008065375 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - CELIX A ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF CUCURBIT YELLOW STUNTING DISORDER VIRUS, A BEMISIA TABACI-TRANSMITTED CLOSTEROVIRUS", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, ST. PAUL, MN, US, (1996), vol. 86, no. 12, ISSN 0031-949X, pages 1370 - 1376, XP000874714 [A] * the whole document * * table 5 *
 [A]  - DIAZ JUAN ANTONIO ET AL, "Potential sources of resistance for melon to nonpersistently aphid-borne viruses.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200308), Database accession no. PREV200300430123, XP002385718 [A] * abstract *
    [] - PLANT DISEASE, (200308), vol. 87, no. 8, ISSN 0191-2917, pages 960 - 964
 [A]  - NUEZ FERNANDO ET AL, "Genetics of Melon yellows virus resistance derived from Cucumis melo ssp. agrestis", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PLANT PATHOLOGY, (199908), vol. 105, no. 5, ISSN 0929-1873, pages 453 - 464, XP002420835 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - SORIA C ET AL, "Resistance mechanisms of Cucumis melo var. agrestis against Trialeurodes vaporariorum and their use to control a closterovirus that causes a yellowing disease of melon", PLANT PATHOLOGY (OXFORD), (1996), vol. 45, no. 4, ISSN 0032-0862, pages 761 - 766, XP002420836 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-3059.1996.d01-169.x