Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965813

EP1965813 - METHODS OF TREATING FIBROSING DISEASES BY INDUCTION OF IMMUNE TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Tennessee Research Foundation
1534 White Avenue, Suite 403
Knoxville, TN 37996 / US
[2008/37]
Inventor(s)01 / POSTLETHWAITE, Arnold, E.
635 Bethany
Eads, TN 38028 / US
02 / KANG, Andrew, H.
6541 Cherryhill Ridge
Memphis, TN 38120 / US
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Griffin, Philippa Jane
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Griffin, Philippa Jane
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2008/37]Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date06837669.816.11.2006
[2008/37]
WO2006US44344
Priority number, dateUS20050737194P16.11.2005         Original published format: US 737194 P
[2008/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007059211
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1965813
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/12, A61K38/39
[2008/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDULNG VON FIBROSIERENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN DURCH INDUKTION VON IMMUNTOLERANZ[2008/37]
English:METHODS OF TREATING FIBROSING DISEASES BY INDUCTION OF IMMUNE TOLERANCE[2008/37]
French:METHODES POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES FIBROSANTES PAR INDUCTION DE TOLERANCE IMMUNITAIRE[2008/37]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2008National basic fee paid 
12.06.2008Search fee paid 
12.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/37]
12.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
14.04.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.06.2016Appeal received No.  T2126/16
26.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.06.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
17.04.2013Request for further processing filed
17.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.05.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
17.04.2013Request for further processing filed
17.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.05.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201207   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2013
30.11.201308   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9950281  (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB]; FARNDALE RICHARD WILLIAM [GB]; BARNES MICHAE) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004041846  (BOYS TOWN NAT RES HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 1,2,5,12 * page 10, line 28 - page 21; claims 1-11 *
 [A]  - FRANKLIN T J, "Progress Towards Drugs to treat Fibrotic Diseases", CHEMISTRY & INDUSTRY, SOCIETY OF CHEMICAL INDUSTRY. LONDON, GB, (19920120), no. 2, ISSN 0009-3068, pages 54 - 57, XP002082480 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5962025  ;
 [Y]US2003060438  ;
 [A]US2003148983  ;
 [A]US2005197283