Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962838

EP1962838 - FARNESOID X RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.08.2012
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
One Franklin Plaza
200 North 16th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/09]For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
One Franklin Plaza 200 North 16th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEATON, David, Norman
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property Dept
Five Moore Drive
PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
02 / MCFADYEN, Robert, Blount
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property Dept
Five Moore Drive
PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
03 / NAVAS, Frank, III
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property Dept
Five Moore Drive
PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
04 / CALDWELL, Richard
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property Dept
Five Moore Drive
PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
05 / SPEARING, Paul, Kenneth
c/o GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property Dept.
Five Moore Drive
PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
 [2011/39]
Former [2008/36]01 / DEATON, David, Norman
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Dept Five Moore Drive PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
02 / MCFADYEN, Robert, Blount
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Dept Five Moore Drive PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
03 / NAVAS, Frank, III
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Dept Five Moore Drive PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
04 / CALDWELL, Richard
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Dept Five Moore Drive PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
05 / SPEARING, Paul, Kenneth
c/o GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property Dept. Five Moore Drive PO Box 13398
Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US
Representative(s)Reeves, Julie Frances , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/27]Reeves, Julie Frances , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Services Unlimited 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2008/36]Phillips, Suzanne J. , et al
Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1) GlaxoSmithKline 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date06840218.913.12.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006US61966
Priority number, dateUS20050751597P19.12.2005         Original published format: US 751597 P
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007076260
Date:05.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1962838
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962838
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D261/06, C07D413/12, A61K31/42, A61P1/16, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P43/00
[2009/47]
Former International [2008/36]A61K31/42, C07D261/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
Extension statesHR18.06.2008
TitleGerman:FARNESOID-X-REZEPTOR-AGONISTEN[2008/36]
English:FARNESOID X RECEPTOR AGONISTS[2008/36]
French:AGONISTES DE RECEPTEUR DE FARNESOIDE X[2008/36]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2008National basic fee paid 
18.06.2008Search fee paid 
18.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
15.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2011Fee for grant paid
10.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2010
Opposition(s)29.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
HU28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
LU13.12.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
TR28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
LU13.12.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
LU13.12.2011
BG28.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2013/25]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
LU13.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/49]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
CH31.12.2011
LI31.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/47]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
IE13.12.2011
GR29.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/37]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/35]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/33]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
NL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
CZ28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
Former [2012/12]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SE28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
GR29.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
Former [2012/08]LT28.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2007092751  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [E] 1-44 * claims 1,17 *;
 [A]WO03015771  (LION BIOSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-44 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007]; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]WO2004048349  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-44 * page 10, line 12 - line 13; claims 1,15 *
International search[Y]US2004048316
 [Y]US2004198980
 [Y]US2004127443
by applicant WO2007109275
  WO03015771
  WO2004048349
  US2004048316