Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025652

EP2025652 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING STABILISED ANHYDRITE III [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.01.2010  [2010/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Palacios Gazules, Christian
Crer Tapis 92
17600 Figueres / ES
For all designated states
Palacios Gazules, José Maria
Crer Tapis 92
17600 Figueres (Girona) / ES
For all designated states
Palacios Gazules, Sergio
Crer Tapis 92
17600 Figueres / ES
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman 35, rue Paradis B.P. 2224
F-13207 Marseille Cedex 01 / FR
Application number, filing date06841802.914.12.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006ES70195
Priority number, dateES2006000008413.01.2006         Original published format: ES 200600084
ES2006000161215.06.2006         Original published format: ES 200601612
[2009/08]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007080202
Date:19.07.2007
Language:ES
[2007/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025652
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C04B11/05, F26B17/10
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERHALT VON STABILISIERTEM ANHYDRIT III[2009/08]
English:METHOD FOR OBTAINING STABILISED ANHYDRITE III[2009/08]
French:PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'ANHYDRITE III STABILISEE[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2008Translation filed 
18.11.2008National basic fee paid 
18.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
01.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/01]
17.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/01]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation
29.11.2008Request for further processing filed
29.11.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
18.11.2008Request for further processing filed
18.11.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
18.11.2008Request for further processing filed
18.11.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
18.11.2008Request for further processing filed
18.11.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200803   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2856679
 [XD]FR2767816
 [A]US4080422
 [A]US4569831
 [A]  MURAT M ET AL: "ACTIVATION OF SOLIDS BY MECHANICAL GRINDING, CONSEQUENCES FOR CALORIMETRIC INVESTIGATION ON THE HYDRATION RATE OF ORTHORHOMBIC ANHYDRITE" THERMOCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 85, 1985, pages 119-122, XP008066981 ISSN: 0040-6031

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6031(85)85544-1