Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1963666

EP1963666 - HIGHLY RELIABLE AND LOW-VOLTAGE SECURE SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U-Shin France SAS
2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
U-Shin France
2-10 Rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle
76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE
42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
94042 Creteil Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GIACOMIN, Fabrice
c/o Valeo Securite Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
F-94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
 [2008/36]
Representative(s)Larger, Solène , et al
U-Shin France SAS
Service Propriété Industrielle
2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
[2014/22]
Former [2010/48]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G. , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2008/36]Utzmann-North, Anne Kiêù-Anh , et al
Valéo Securité Habitacle 42 rue Le Corbusier
94042 Creteil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date06841811.017.11.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006FR02536
Priority number, dateFR2005001167317.11.2005         Original published format: FR 0511673
[2008/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007057572
Date:24.05.2007
Language:FR
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1963666
Date:03.09.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:F02N11/04, H01H27/06
[2008/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
TitleGerman:HOCHZUVERLÄSSIGER NIEDRIGSPANNNUNGSSICHERHEITSSCHALTER[2008/36]
English:HIGHLY RELIABLE AND LOW-VOLTAGE SECURE SWITCH[2008/36]
French:INTERRUPTEUR SECURISE A FAIBLE COURANT ET A FIABILITE AUGMENTEE[2008/36]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2008National basic fee paid 
17.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
01.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
28.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201510   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5256956
 [X]US1525129
 [X]US3339035
 [X]FR2109134