Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026884

EP2026884 - COMPOSITE TEXTILE MATERIAL AND ARTICLE OF PROTECTION FOR NRBC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.02.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Boye Technologies
45 Quai de Bosc
34200 Sète / FR
[2016/10]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Paul Boye Technologies
45 Quai De Bosc
34200 Sete / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOYE Jacques
c/o Paul Boye Technologies
45 Quai de Bosc
F-34200 Sete / FR
 [2016/10]
Former [2009/09]01 / BOYE Jacques
c/o Paul Boye Technologies 45 Quai de Bosc
F-34200 Sete / FR
Representative(s)Misrahi, Elie René
5, rue de Phalsbourg
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/10]Combenègre, Jean-Paul
61, avenue des Ternes
75017 Paris / FR
Former [2009/09]Combenègre, Jean-Paul
15, rue Margueritte
F-75017 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06841963.915.12.2006
[2009/09]
WO2006FR02760
Priority number, dateFR2005001291119.12.2005         Original published format: FR 0512911
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007071835
Date:28.06.2007
Language:FR
[2007/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026884
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026884
Date:09.03.2016
Language:FR
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:A62D5/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBUNDTEXTILMATERIAL UND SCHUTZARTIKEL FÜR NRBC-ANWENDUNGEN[2009/09]
English:COMPOSITE TEXTILE MATERIAL AND ARTICLE OF PROTECTION FOR NRBC APPLICATIONS[2009/09]
French:MATERIAU TEXTILE COMPOSITE ET ARTICLE DE PROTECTION POUR APPLICATIONS NRBC[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2008National basic fee paid 
11.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
04.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2010Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
15.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2010Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
18.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
22.12.2015Fee for grant paid
22.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.12.2016  10.01.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Blücher GmbH
Mettmanner Str. 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/03]
Opponent(s)01  07.12.2016   
Blücher GmbH
Mettmanner Str. 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 62
45130 Essen / DE
17.01.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.05.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
27.08.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.08.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2267/18
04.01.2019Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2267/18
20.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
22.12.2015Request for further processing filed
22.12.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.01.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200904   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.12.2006
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE15.12.2016
LU15.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU15.12.2006
AT09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE15.12.2016
LU15.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
IE15.12.2016
LU15.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/36]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/20]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
GR10.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[DXY]FR2678172  (BOYE MANUFACTURE VETEMENTS PAUL) [DX] 1-5,8-11 * the whole document * [Y] 1,6,7;
 [Y]US2001018095  (SHLENKER ROBIN RENEE THILL ET AL) [Y] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0014] , [0031] , [0032] , [0035] , [0047] , [0059] , [0061] , [0063] , [0054] , [0155] * * claims 1,13,14 *;
 [X]US2005042400  (CERBINI STEFANO ET AL) [X] 1-5,10,11 * claim - *;
 [A]EP1092471  (EUROCHEM)
OppositionFR2678172
 US2001018095
 US2005042400
 EP1092471
 US5277963
 US5334436
 FR2656459
 DE69018410T
 FR2799387
 US6464887
 US5731065
 EP0562264
 DE69207986T
 DE20319676U
 US2007134483
 DE10356776
 US2005079379
 US2005191918
 US2009093178
 DE3210070
 WO9637365
 DE20318173U
 DE10318053
 DE20317080U
 DE1619297
 DE4310110
 US5024594
 DE10240548
 DE10360845
 WO2004037026
 EP1433394
 US2004116025
 JP2005246162
 US5609947
    - "Vliesstoff", Wikipedia, der freien Enzyklopadie, (20160709), pages 1 - 22, URL: https://de.wikipedia.orglwiki/Vliesstoff, XP055333644

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/https.//de.wikipedia.org.wiki/Viiesstoff
    - "Uniguard: Wide Range of Ophthalmic Surgical Drapes from OMS", OMS, (20150626), URL: http://www.oms-india.com/drapes.pdf, XP055333638
    - ISO, "Textilien-Bestimmung der Luftdurch- lässigkeit von textilen Flächengebilden", DIN EN ISO 9237:1995-12, (19951200), XP055334021
    - "Textilien - Physiologische Wir- kung - Messung des Wärme- und Wasserdampfdurchgangswiderstands unter stationären Bedingungen (sweating guarded-hotplate Test)", DIN EN ISO 11092 2014-12, (20041200), XP055334030
    - ISO, "Wärmewiderstandsverhalten (Thermal Resistance) sowie zum Wasserdampfwi- derstand (Water-Vapour Resistance", ISO (International Organisation for Standardization), (20140000), XP055334041
    - "Nylon", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20161129), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Nylon, XP055333640
    - "Aktivkohle", Wikipedia, der freien Enzyklopädie, (20161124), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Aktivkohle, XP055333650
    - "Aktivkohle", Pharmawiki, (20160921), URL: http://www.pharmawiki.ch/wiki/index.php?wiki=Aktivkohle, XP055334034
    - "Vliesstoff", Wikipedia, der freien Enzyklopädie, (20161207), pages 1 - 22, URL: https.//de.wikipedia.org.wiki/Viiesstoff, XP055333644

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/https.//de.wikipedia.org.wiki/Viiesstoff
    - Anonymous, "Uniguard: Wide Range of Ophthalmic Surgical Drapes from OMS®", OMS, (20150626), XP055333638
    - Anonymous, "Nylon", Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, (20161130), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Nylon, XP055333640
    - Anonym, "Aktivkohle", Wikipedia, der freien Enzyklopädie, (20161124), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Aktivkohle;, XP055333650
    - Anonym, "Aktivkohle", PharmaWiki, URL: http://www.pharmawiki.ch/wiki/index.php?wiki=Aktivkohle, XP055334034