Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962826

EP1962826 - METHOD FOR WEIGHT REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EGB EpiGeneticBalance AG
Alpenweg 9
4313 Möhlin / CH
[2012/20]
Former [2012/11]For all designated states
Energy4life AG
Alpenweg 9
4313 Möhlin / CH
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Energy4Life GmbH
Alpenweg 9
4313 Möhlin / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ROHNER, Markus
Alpenweg 9
CH-4313 Möhlin / CH
 [2008/36]
Representative(s)Schöllhorn, Andreas , et al
Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG
Aeschenvorstadt 55
4051 Basel / CH
[2012/34]
Former [2011/46]Schöllhorn, Andreas
Katzarov SA, Patent and Trademark Attorneys, 19, rue des Epinettes
1227 Genève / CH
Former [2008/36]Schöllhorn, Andreas
Katzarov SA, Patent and Trademark Attorneys, 19, rue des Epinettes
1227 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date06842216.104.12.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006IB03455
Priority number, dateUS20050741889P05.12.2005         Original published format: US 741889 P
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007066192
Date:14.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1962826
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962826
Date:16.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/205, A61K31/353, A23L1/29, A61K36/185, A61P3/04, A61P5/48
[2008/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GEWICHTSREDUKTION[2008/36]
English:METHOD FOR WEIGHT REDUCTION[2008/36]
French:PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DU POIDS[2008/36]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2008National basic fee paid 
07.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
21.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2010Observations by third parties
11.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2011Fee for grant paid
04.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2011
Opposition(s)17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
FI16.11.2011
HU16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
TR16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
LU04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
ES27.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
FI16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
TR16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
LU04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
ES27.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2013/29]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
FI16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
LU04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
ES27.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2013/25]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
LU04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
ES27.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2013/22]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
ES27.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/47]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
IE04.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
RO16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
SK16.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
DK16.11.2011
EE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
BG16.02.2012
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
CZ16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/33]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
MC31.12.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE16.11.2011
CY16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/26]BE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
PL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE16.11.2011
LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT16.11.2011
LV16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
SE16.11.2011
SI16.11.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT16.11.2011
NL16.11.2011
GR17.02.2012
IS16.03.2012
PT16.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT16.11.2011
IS16.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT16.11.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005034650  (IOVATE HEALTH SCIENCES RES INC [CA]; JACOBS IRA [CA]; GARDINER PAUL T) [X] 1-30 * the whole document * * in particular * * 'Summary of the Invention', p. 4, l. 20 - p. 6, l. 23 * * page 11, line 16 - page 13, line 13 * * page 14, line 13 - line 23 * * page 15 * * page 16, line 17 - page 17, line 8 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [XY]WO9907388  (MCCARTY MARK F [US]; GUSTIN JOHN [US]) [X] 1-16 * 'Summary of the Invention' * * example 1 * * Claims * [Y] 17-30;
 [XY]  - ALBANESE C V ET AL, "FAT MASS LOSS IN OBESE SUBJECTS TREATED WITH CARNITINE: A WHOLE BODY DXA EVALUATION", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050923), vol. 20, no. 9 SUPPL 1, ISSN 0884-0431, page S218, XP009085780 [X] 1-10,14-16 * the whole document * [Y] 11-13,17-30
 [XY]  - LOFGREN INGRID E ET AL, "WEIGHT LOSS FAVORABLY MODIFIES ANTHROPOMETRICS AND REVERSES THE METABOLIC SYNDROME IN PREMENOPAUSAL WOMEN", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF NUTRITION, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF NUTRION, WILMINGTON, NC, US, (200512), vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 0731-5724, pages 486 - 493, XP009085779 [X] 1-10,14-16 * the whole document * * in particular * * page 487, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 487, column R * * 'Experimental Design' * * 'Discussion' * [Y] 11-13,17-30
 [XY]  - VILLANI R G ET AL, "L-Carnitine supplementation combined with aerobic training does not promote weight loss in moderately obese women", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SPORT NUTRITION 2000 UNITED STATES, (2000), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 1050-1606, pages 199 - 207, XP009085992 [X] 1-10,14-16 * the whole document * * in particular * * abstract * * 'Introduction' 'Methods' 'Discussion' * [Y] 11-13,17-30
 [Y]  - SEAMON M J ET AL, "EPHEDRA: YESTERDAY, DSHEA, AND TOMORROW - A TEN YEAR PERSPECTIVE ON THE DIETARY SUPPLEMENT HEALTH AND EDUCATION ACT OF 1994", JOURNAL OF HERBAL PHARMACOTHERAPY, HAWORTH HERBAL PRESS, BINGHAMTON, US, (2005), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1522-8940, pages 67 - 86, XP009085769 [Y] 17-30 * page 77 - page 78 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1300/J157v05n03_07
 [T]  - ANONYMOUS, "X-Form plus mit Orangen Aroma", INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: http://www.sevisana.ch/produkte/x_form_%20plus.php, (20070703), XP002440595 [T] 1-30 * the whole document *
 [T]  - ANONYMOUS, "Unterstützung der Fettverbrennung mit move bei bewegung", INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: http://www.energy4life.ch/cms/front_content.php?idcat=172, (20070703), XP002440596 [T] 1-30 * the whole document *
other   - "Sthaulyaghnopadesh", TKDL, XP003026601
    - "Sthaulyaharayogah", TKDL, XP003026602
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Kunjad", TKDL, XP003026603
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Khali", TKDL, XP003026604
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, "Karuvanga Chendooram 3", TKDL, XP007913284
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, "Nuskha Muhazzil", TKDL, XP003026605
    - AGASTHIYAR, "Kaareya chenduram", TKDL, XP003026606
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, "Kalnaar Parpam 2", TKDL, XP003026607
    - KANNUSAMY PILLAI, "Linga Thylam", TKDL, XP003026608
    - "Lasuna (kanda)", TKDL, XP003026609