Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1957185

EP1957185 - DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTERS HAVING ULTRA-THIN CATALYZED OXIDATION COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US
Former [2008/34]For all designated states
BASF Catalysts LLC
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park NJ 07932 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DETTLING, Joseph, Charles
8 Spicy Pond Road
Howell, NJ 07731 / US
02 / LI, Yuejin
8 East Drive
Edison, NJ 08820 / US
 [2008/34]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Altmann, Andreas , et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner
Patentanwälte
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2010/36]Altmann, Andreas , et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2010/10]Altmann, Andreas , et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 8
80331 München / DE
Former [2008/34]Altmann, Andreas
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06844299.508.11.2006
[2008/34]
WO2006US43574
Priority number, dateUS2005027100410.11.2005         Original published format: US 271004
[2008/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007058867
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1957185
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1957185
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/10, F01N3/022, F01N3/035
[2013/36]
Former International [2008/34]B01D53/94, F01N3/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIESELTEILCHENFILTER MIT ULTRADÜNNEN KATALYSIERTEN OXIDATIONSBESCHICHTUNGEN[2008/34]
English:DIESEL PARTICULATE FILTERS HAVING ULTRA-THIN CATALYZED OXIDATION COATINGS[2008/34]
French:FILTRES A PARTICULES DIESEL DOTES DE REVETEMENTS CATALYSEURS D'OXYDATION ULTRA-MINCES[2008/34]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2008National basic fee paid 
28.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/34]
28.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2014Fee for grant paid
31.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Nunn, Andrew Dominic
Johnson Matthey PLC
Gate 20
Orchard Road
Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/04]
Opponent(s)01  12.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Nunn, Andrew Dominic
Johnson Matthey PLC
Gate 20
Orchard Road
Royston
Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB
27.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1173/17
28.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2006
AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
IE08.11.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU08.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
LU08.11.2014
Former [2015/08]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
ES12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CY12.03.2014
FI12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[PX]DE102005021658  (NANO X GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; claim - *;
 [PX]FR2875149  (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [PX] 1-12 * page 12, line 37 - page 13, line 10; claim - *;
 [X]JP2004058013  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1129764  (DMC2 DEGUSSA METALS CATALYSTS [DE]) [X] 1-12 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP1398081  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * figure -; claim - *;
 [PX]DE102004040550  (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029]; claim - *;
 [X]JPS5261192  ;
 [X]US2002053202  (AKAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * claim - *;
 [A]WO2005016497  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 26, Database accession no. 1977-46164Y, XP002425483 & JPS5261192 A 19770520 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0335847
 US6375910
 EP0611192
by applicantUS5417956
 US5460701
 US5466646
 US5514349
 US5874684
 US6423293