Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024108

EP2024108 - CLEANING OF ELECTROSTATIC CHUCKS USING ULTRASONIC AGITATION AND APPLIED ELECTRIC FIELDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lam Research Corporation
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538-6470 / US
[2014/26]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Lam Research Corporation
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538-6470 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEGER, Robert, J.
754 The Alameda, No. 3207
San Jose, California 95126 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Kontrus, Gerhard , et al
Lam Research AG
SEZ-Strasse 1
9500 Villach / AT
[2012/43]
Former [2009/08]Morf, Jan Stefan , et al
Abitz & Partner Hörselbergstrasse 5
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date06845188.911.12.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006US47183
Priority number, dateUS2005031527223.12.2005         Original published format: US 315272
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007078656
Date:12.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2024108
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2024108
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.06.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B08B3/12
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REINIGUNG ELEKTROSTATISCHER SPANNFUTTER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ULTRASCHALL-BEWEGUNG UND ANGELEGTE ELEKTRISCHE FELDER[2009/08]
English:CLEANING OF ELECTROSTATIC CHUCKS USING ULTRASONIC AGITATION AND APPLIED ELECTRIC FIELDS[2009/08]
French:NETTOYAGE DE DISPOSITIFS DE SERRAGE ÉLECTROSTATIQUES (ESC) AU MOYEN DE L AGITATION ULTRASONIQUE ET DE CHAMPS ÉLECTRIQUES APPLIQUÉS[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2008National basic fee paid 
30.10.2008Search fee paid 
30.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
04.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2014Fee for grant paid
19.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2013
Opposition(s)26.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.12.2013Request for further processing filed
06.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.12.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
12.12.2008Request for further processing filed
12.12.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
12.12.2008Request for further processing filed
12.12.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2006
AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
TR25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/27]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
MC25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/25]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
BG25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SI25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/48]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
LU11.12.2014
Former [2015/30]AT25.06.2014
BE25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
DK25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
IT25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT25.06.2014
CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
NL25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
IS25.10.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
PL25.06.2014
RO25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
PT27.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY25.06.2014
CZ25.06.2014
EE25.06.2014
ES25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
SK25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
LV25.06.2014
SE25.06.2014
GR26.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY25.06.2014
FI25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY25.06.2014
LT25.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY25.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[AP]US7052553  (SHIH HONG [US], et al) [AP] 1,10,13,15 * the whole document * * in particular * * column 7, line 16 - column 7, line 37 * * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]RU2040308  (IR NII AVIAT T I ORGANIZATSII [SU]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2002096189  (KUME SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6045428  (ANDERSON LESLIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-4,10 * the whole document * * in particular * * column 3, line 55 - page 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 6 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2004105970  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5,7,10,14 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2004231706
 [Y]US2003180459
 [Y]US6352081
 [A]US5507874
 [A]US2002153024
by applicant WO2004105970