Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1960409

EP1960409 - TETRAPHOSPHORUS LIGANDS FOR CATALYTIC HYDROFORMYLATION AND RELATED REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PENN STATE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
304 Old Main
University Park, PA 16802 / US
[2008/35]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Xumu
28 Meadow Lark
Plainsboro, NJ 08356 / US
02 / YAN, Yongjun
2747 Del Medio CT 206
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
 [2008/49]
Former [2008/35]01 / ZHANG, Xumu
28 Meadow Lark
Plainsboro, NJ 08356 / US
02 / YAN, Yongjun
710 S. Atherton Street Apt. 303
State College, PA 16801 / US
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2014/24]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
26 Mallinson Road
London SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2013/25]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London
W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2010/27]Hill, Justin John , et al
IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row
London, W1S 3PF / GB
Former [2008/35]Hill, Justin John , et al
McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate
London EC2N 3AR / GB
Application number, filing date06845453.715.12.2006
[2008/35]
WO2006US47766
Priority number, dateUS20050750733P15.12.2005         Original published format: US 750733 P
[2008/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007078859
Date:12.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1960409
Date:27.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007
[2008/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1960409
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07C45/60, C07F9/46, C07F9/58, C07F9/6568, C07F9/6571, C07F9/6584, C07F15/00, C07F9/50, C07F9/572, C07C45/50
[2013/07]
Former International [2008/35]C07F9/572
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TETRAPHOSPHORLIGANDEN FÜR KATALYTISCHE HYDROFORMYLIERUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE REAKTIONEN[2008/35]
English:TETRAPHOSPHORUS LIGANDS FOR CATALYTIC HYDROFORMYLATION AND RELATED REACTIONS[2008/35]
French:LIGANDS TETRAPHOSPHORE POUR HYDROFORMYLATION CATALYTIQUE ET REACTIONS ASSOCIEES[2008/35]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2008National basic fee paid 
23.05.2008Search fee paid 
23.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/35]
19.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2013Fee for grant paid
23.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  10.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Operations GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2014  10.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Evonik Degussa GmbH
Rellinghauserstrasse 1-11
45128 Essen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.09.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2015
09.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.11.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition01.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2593/17
06.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
20.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.12.2006
AT04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IE15.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
TR04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IE15.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/48]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IE15.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
IT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
LU15.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/23]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/22]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY26.06.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY26.06.2013
AT04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
PL04.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY26.06.2013
AT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT04.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]  - VAN DER SLOT, SASKIA C. ET AL, "Rhodium-Catalyzed Hydroformylation and Deuterioformylation with Pyrrolyl-Based Phosphorus Amidite Ligands: Influence of Electronic Ligand Properties", ORGANOMETALLICS , 21(19), 3873-3883 CODEN: ORGND7; ISSN: 0276-7333, (2002), XP002499691 [A] 1,9,12,14 * abstract * * compounds 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OM010760Y
 [A]  - KUNZE, C. ET AL, "Synthesis of new calix[4]arene-based phosphorus ligands and their application in the Rh(I) catalyzed hydroformylation of 1-octene", HETEROATOM CHEMISTRY , 12(7), 577-585 CODEN: HETCE8; ISSN: 1042-7163, (2001), XP002499692 [A] 1,9,12,14 * abstract * * compounds 1-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hc.1088
 [A]  - AIKAWA ET AL, "Atropos but achiral tris (phosphanyl) biphenyl ligands for Ru-catalyzed asymmetric hydrogenation", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2003), vol. 42, pages 5455 - 5458, XP002499693 [A] 1,9,12,14 * table 1 * * Schemes 1-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200352277
 [A]  - PACIELLO, ROCCO ET AL, "Structure-activity relationship for chelating phosphite ligands used in rhodium-catalyzed hydroformylations", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL , 143(1-3), 85-97 CODEN: JMCCF2; ISSN: 1381-1169, (1999), XP002499694 [A] 1,9,12,14 * abstract * * compound 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1169(98)00370-7
 [PX]  - YAN, YONGJUN ET AL, "A Tetraphosphorus Ligand for Highly Regioselective Isomerization-Hydroformylation of Internal Olefins", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 128(50), 16058-16061, (20061124), XP002499695 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA0622249
International search[Y]US6846945  ;
 [Y]US3420864  ;
 [Y]US6437192