Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1974303

EP1974303 - MEDICATION ORDER PROCESSING AND RECONCILIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CareFusion 303, Inc.
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2011/07]
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Cardinal Health 303 Inc.
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BATCH, Richard, M.
13193 Portofino Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
 [2008/40]
Representative(s)Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/29]Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2009/15]Hill, Justin John , et al
McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate
London EC2N 3AR / GB
Former [2008/44]Barton, Matthew Thomas
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2008/40]Barton, Matthew Thomas
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06845794.419.12.2006
[2008/40]
WO2006US48393
Priority number, dateUS2005032578230.12.2005         Original published format: US 325782
[2008/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007078937
Date:12.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1974303
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007
[2008/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2008/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/40]
TitleGerman:MEDIKATIONSBESTELLUNGSVERARBEITUNG UND ABSTIMMUNG[2008/40]
English:MEDICATION ORDER PROCESSING AND RECONCILIATION[2008/40]
French:TRAITEMENT ET COMPARAISON D'ORDONNANCES MEDICALES[2008/40]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2008National basic fee paid 
29.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/40]
12.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/41]
22.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003140928  (BUI TUAN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005101279  (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 13 * * page 43, line 24 - page 53, line 30 * * page 62, line 22 - page 71, line 2 *;
 [A]WO2005055112  (ALARIS MEDICAL SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004176984  (WHITE GALE [US], et al) [A] 1,8,14 * paragraph [0014] *