Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1964022

EP1964022 - UNLOCKING A DEVICE BY PERFORMING GESTURES ON AN UNLOCK IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUDHRI, Imran
300 Linden Street, No. 7
San Francisco, CA 94102 / US
02 / ORDING, Bas
44 Newburg Street
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
03 / ANZURES, Freddy, A.
Apartment 102 555 Pierce Street
San Francisco, CA 94117 / US
04 / VAN OS, Marcel
Unit A 116 Lundy's Lane
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
05 / LEMAY, Stephen, O.
735 Kirkham Street
San Francisco, CA 94122 / US
06 / FORSTALL, Scott
329 Martens Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
07 / CHRISTIE, Greg
1112 Kelly Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
 [2009/01]
Former [2008/36]01 / CHAUDHRI, Imran
300 Linden Street, No. 7
San Francisco, CA 94102 / US
02 / ORDING, Bas
1119 Dolores Street 4
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
03 / ANZURES, Freddy, A.
Apartment 102 555 Pierce Street
San Francisco, CA 94117 / US
04 / VAN OS, Marcel
Unit A 116 Lundy's Lane
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
05 / LEMAY, Stephen, O.
165 B. Noe Street
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
06 / FORSTALL, Scott
329 Martens Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
07 / CHRISTIE, Greg
1112 Kelly Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date06846405.630.11.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006US61370
Priority number, dateUS2005032254923.12.2005         Original published format: US 322549
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007076210
Date:05.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1964022
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1964022
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/20, G06F3/048
[2008/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTSPERRUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG DURCH DURCHFÜHRUNG VON GESTEN AUF EINEM ENTSPERRUNGSBILD[2008/36]
English:UNLOCKING A DEVICE BY PERFORMING GESTURES ON AN UNLOCK IMAGE[2008/36]
French:DEVERROUILLAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF PAR DES GESTES EFFECTUES SUR UNE IMAGE DE DEVERROUILLAGE[2009/37]
Former [2008/36]DEVERROUILLAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF PAR DES GESTES EFFECTUES SUR UNE IMAGE NON VERROUILLEE
Entry into regional phase26.06.2008National basic fee paid 
26.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
25.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2009Fee for grant paid
14.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09170574.9  / EP2128782
EP10194359.5  / EP2299381
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)     
deleted
 [2011/08]
Former [2011/06]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2010   
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Opponent's representative
Niederkofler, Oswald
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
13.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
TR10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
HU11.09.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
LU30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
HU11.09.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
LU30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2012/42]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
HU11.09.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/38]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/33]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/19]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
DK10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
IT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
PT12.07.2010
Former [2011/06]AT10.03.2010
BE10.03.2010
CY10.03.2010
EE10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
RO10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
SK10.03.2010
BG10.06.2010
GR11.06.2010
IS10.07.2010
Former [2010/42]AT10.03.2010
LT10.03.2010
LV10.03.2010
PL10.03.2010
SI10.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2004001560
 [Y]US5821933
 [A]US5907327
 [A]  "ACCESS/CONTROL ICONS (ICON KEYS)" IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, vol. 38, no. 4, 1 April 1995 (1995-04-01), pages 407-409, XP000516196 ISSN: 0018-8689