Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1962886

EP1962886 - STABLE PROTEIN FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/42]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DALI, Manisha, M.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
02 / DAHLHEIM, Charles, E.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
03 / BORSADIA, Sunita
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
04 / NARINGREKAR, Vijay H.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
05 / GANDHI, Rajesh B.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
06 / NERURKAR, Manoj
601B Devare House
Bhavanishankar Road
Dadar, Mumbai 400028 / IN
 [2013/42]
Former [2008/36]01 / DALI, Manisha, M.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
02 / DAHLHEIM, Charles, E.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
03 / BORSADIA, Sunita
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
04 / NARINGREKAR, Vijay H.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08903 / US
05 / GANDHI, Rajesh B.
c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 1 Squibb Drive
New Brunswick, NJ 08903 / US
06 / NERURKAR, Manoj
601B Devare House Bhavanishankar Road
Dadar, Mumbai 400028 / IN
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/42]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/36]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06846683.819.12.2006
[2008/36]
WO2006US62297
Priority number, dateUS20050752150P20.12.2005         Original published format: US 752150 P
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007076354
Date:05.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1962886
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007
[2008/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1962886
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K38/00, A61K47/26, C07K14/705
[2013/32]
Former International [2008/36]A61K38/17, C07K14/705
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/36]
Extension statesHR20.06.2008
MK20.06.2008
RS20.06.2008
TitleGerman:STABILE PROTEINFORMULIERUNGEN[2008/36]
English:STABLE PROTEIN FORMULATIONS[2008/36]
French:FORMULATIONS DE PROTEINE STABLES[2008/36]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase20.06.2008National basic fee paid 
20.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
25.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2013Fee for grant paid
30.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  16.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ISENBRUCK BÖSL HÖRSCHLER LLP
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
D-81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  16.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ISENBRUCK BÖSL HÖRSCHLER LLP
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
D-81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  16.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ISENBRUCK BÖSL HÖRSCHLER LLP
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
D-81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/40]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  16.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Brien, Simon Warwick
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  15.07.2014  21.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ISENBRUCK BÖSL HÖRSCHLER LLP
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
D-81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lahrtz, Fritz
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/34]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.2014  16.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Brien, Simon Warwick
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 02  15.07.2014   
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  15.07.2014   
ISENBRUCK BÖSL HÖRSCHLER LLP
Prinzregentenstrasse 68
D-81675 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Teschemacher, Andrea
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
21.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.08.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2342/16
22.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2342/16
12.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.10.2009Request for further processing filed
14.10.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0202638  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 26-35,37,38,73,74,76 * page 31, line 13 - page 32, line 17; figures 19,24; claims 1-39 * * page 61, line 20 - line 25 * [Y] 1-14,24,25,36,39,43,48-53,55-59,70-72;
 [Y]WO02058729  (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,24-39,43,48-53,55-59,70-75,77 * claims 1-43 *;
 [Y]WO9704801  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-14,24-39,43,48-53,55-59,70-75,77 * page 1, line 8 - line 30; claims 10-13 * * page 15 *;
 [Y]WO2004091658  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14,24-39,43,48-53,55-59,70-75,77 * page 46, line 5 - page 51, line 33; claims 1,22-27 *;
 [PY]WO2006044908  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-14,24-39,43,48-53,55-59,70-75,77 * page 12, line 39 - page 13, line 8; claims 1-16,28-39 *
by applicantWO0202638
 WO02058729
 WO9704801
 WO2004091658
 US7094874
 US2003083246
 US2004022787
 US2005019859
 US2005084933
    - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1977), vol. 198, page 1056
    - GOEDDEL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057
    - SHIMATAKE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, page 128
    - COHEN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1972), vol. 69, page 2110
 US20050752267
 US20060849543
 US20060399666