Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1969745

EP1969745 - USE OF TIMING AND SYNCHRONIZATION OF AN ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEX IN COMBINED SATELLITE-TERRESTRIAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2013
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.12.2013  [2013/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telcom Ventures, L.L.C.
200 South Biscayne Boulevard, 40th Floor
Miami, FL 33131-2398 / US
[2008/51]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Telcom Ventures, L.L.C.
201 North Union Street Suite 360
Alexandria VA 22314 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Rajendra
3801 Belle Rive Terrace Alexandria
VA 22309 / US
02 / OLEXA, George, Ron
4929 Gairloch Lane
Gainesville, GA 30506 / US
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Freeman, Avi , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Avi , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2009/37]Flint, Adam
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London
WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2008/38]Flint, Adam
Beck Greener, Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date06846794.322.12.2006
[2008/38]
WO2006US62566
Priority number, dateUS20060755075P03.01.2006         Original published format: US 755075 P
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007081657
Date:19.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1969745
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007
[2008/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON TIMING UND SYNCHRONISATION EINES ORTHOGONALEN FREQUENZTEILUNGS-MULTIPLEX IN EINEM KOMBINIERTEN SATELLITEN-/ERD-NETZWERK[2008/38]
English:USE OF TIMING AND SYNCHRONIZATION OF AN ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEX IN COMBINED SATELLITE-TERRESTRIAL NETWORK[2008/38]
French:UTILISATION DE CHRONOMETRAGE ET DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UN MULTIPLEXAGE PAR LA REPARTITION ORTHOGONALE DE LA FREQUENCE DANS UN RESEAU COMBINE SATELLITAIRE/TERRESTRE[2008/38]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2008National basic fee paid 
04.06.2008Search fee paid 
04.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
01.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/52]
20.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5444697  ;
 [A]US4599647  ;
 [A]US3742498  ;
 [A]US2001038674