Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965649

EP1965649 - PROTECTION OF PLANTS AGAINST THEIR PATHOGENIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.11.2014  [2014/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lesaffre et Compagnie
41, rue Etienne Marcel
75001 Paris / FR
[2013/35]
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
Lesaffre et Compagnie
41, rue Etienne Marcel
75001 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PUJOS, Philippe
14, rue d'Alembert
F-59000 Lille / FR
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2012/19]Touati, Catherine
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2011/28]August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2009/12]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2009/09]Pochart, François
Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2008/37]Gallois, Valérie , et al
Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date06848817.021.12.2006
[2008/37]
WO2006FR51414
Priority number, dateFR2005001305021.12.2005         Original published format: FR 0513050
[2008/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007074303
Date:05.07.2007
Language:FR
[2007/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1965649
Date:10.09.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1965649
Date:28.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01N63/04, A01P3/00, A01P1/00
[2013/11]
Former International [2008/37]A01N63/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
Extension statesAL10.06.2008
BA10.06.2008
HR10.06.2008
MK10.06.2008
RS10.06.2008
TitleGerman:SCHUTZ VON PFLANZEN GEGEN IHRE KRANKHEITSERREGER[2008/37]
English:PROTECTION OF PLANTS AGAINST THEIR PATHOGENIC AGENTS[2008/37]
French:PROTECTION DES PLANTES CONTRE LEURS AGENTS PATHOGENES[2008/37]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2008National basic fee paid 
10.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/37]
14.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2013Fee for grant paid
17.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2010
Opposition(s)30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Licence(s)ID:01 01/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR]
Licencee:Agro Levures & Dérivés SAS
14 Rue d'Alembert
59000 Lille / FR
Date:06.10.2009
[2010/10]
Former [2010/01]ID:01 01/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR]
Licencee:Philippe Pujos
14 Rue d'Alembert
59000 Lille / FR
Date:06.10.2009
[2010/10]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IE21.12.2013
IS28.12.2013
[2014/48]
Former [2014/38]CY28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/23]CY28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY26.06.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY26.06.2013
FI28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY26.06.2013
LT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
IS28.12.2013
Former [2014/09]LT28.08.2013
SE28.08.2013
Former [2014/08]LT28.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9903346  (LABORATOIRES GOEMAR S.A; YVIN, JEAN-CLAUDE; CRUZ, FLORENCE; JOUBERT, J) [Y] 1-30 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, lines 18-24 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 5 * * page 6, lines 15-33 * * page 9; example 3 * * page 13; examples 7,8 *;
 [X]JP2005073640  (HASEGAWA T CO LTD) [X] 24 * abstract *;
 [Y]  - OZERETSKOVSKAYA O L ET AL, "OLIGOSACCHARINS AS REGULATORY MOLECULES OF PLANTS", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, MOSCOW, RU, (1996), vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 1021-4437, pages 648 - 655, XP002061729 [Y] 1-30 * page 648, column R - page 649, column R *
 [A]  - NGUYEN T H ET AL, "Composition of the cell walls of several yeast species", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199808), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 206 - 212, XP002398683 [A] 24 * -Preparation of cell walls- -Preparation of wall fractions-; page 207 * * -Discussion-; page 210 - page 211 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530051278
 [A]  - MORILHAT J.P. ET AL., "Etudes sur al composition chimique de la parois d'une levurecandida aprés croissance sur n- paraffine", MYCOPATHOLOGIA, (1977), vol. 61, no. 1, pages 49 - 54, XP009072285 [A] 24 * page 49 - page 50 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00440758
 [A]  - PILLEMER, L. ET AL., "The Properdin system and Immunity- III the Zymosan assay of Properdinn", J. EXP. MED, (1957), vol. 103, no. 1, pages 1 - 13, XP002398776 [A] 24 * page 3 - page 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.103.1.1
 [A]  - BUCK, J.W., "Combinations of fungicides with Phyllopane Yeasrs for improved control of Botrytis cinerea on geranium Seedlings", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (2004), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 196 - 202, XP002398684 [A] 1-30 * page 197, column L * * - Discussion -; page 200 - page 201 *