Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1965649


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
15.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
04.07.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
28.03.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
26.07.2013 (Expected) grant published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
19.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.07.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.04.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.02.2013 Change - classification published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
08.02.2013 Change - classification published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
14.12.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.08.2012 Change - representative published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
23.07.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.04.2012 Change - representative published on  09.05.2012  [2012/19]
15.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.12.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.06.2011 Change - representative published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
17.12.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.11.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.07.2010 First examination report
09.07.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.02.2010 Licence published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
17.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2009 Licence published on  06.01.2010  [2010/01]
13.02.2009 Change - representative published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
23.01.2009 Change - representative published on  25.02.2009  [2009/09]
08.08.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
08.08.2008 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
16.07.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2008 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
19.06.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2007 PCT data prior to European publication