Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1965649

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CYLapse: 28.08.2013
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EELapse: 28.08.2013
 ES 
 FILapse: 28.08.2013
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HU 
 IELapse: 21.12.2013
 ISLapse: 28.12.2013
 IT 
 LI 
 LTLapse: 28.08.2013
 LU 
LVLapse: 28.08.2013
 MCLapse: 28.08.2013
 NL 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SELapse: 28.08.2013
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure17.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Licence(s)ID:01 01/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR]
Licencee:Agro Levures & Dérivés SAS
14 Rue d'Alembert
59000 Lille / FR
Date:06.10.2009
[2010/10]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2008National basic fee paid 
10.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted28.08.2013
Opposition procedure30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit published on 06.08.2014 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20080610
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:10.09.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:06.01.2010 
Event description:LICENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:0101 PHILIPPE PUJOS
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:10.03.2010 
Event description:LICENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:0101 AGRO LEVURES & DERIVES SAS
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:18.08.2010 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20100714
 
Event date:13.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01P 3/00 20060101ALI20130205BHEP
 
Event date:13.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01P 1/00 20060101ALI20130205BHEP
 
Event date:13.03.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A01N 63/04 20060101AFI20130205BHEP
 
Event date:01.05.2013 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20130403
 
Event date:28.08.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:28.08.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:28.08.2013 
Event description:LICENCE RECORDED
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Free Format Text:EXCLUSIVE LICENSE
Name of Requester:AGRO LEVURES & DERIVES SAS, FR
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:28.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 628775 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20130915
 
Event date:09.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH
 
Event date:24.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602006038167 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20131024
 
Event date:12.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:18.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20131111
 
Event date:19.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20131112
 
Event date:11.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:18.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2435085 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20131218
 
Event date:27.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20131228
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130626
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:27.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20130402359 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20140102
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:04.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 15275 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006038167 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:30.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E019477 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:06.08.2014 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20140530
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130828
 
Event date:11.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602006038167 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20140530
 
Event date:24.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.10.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20131221
 
Event date:10.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:29.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20141221
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:02.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20181114
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20181120
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20181120
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20181119
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20181120
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20181129
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20181116
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20181126
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20181120
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20181127
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20181211
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20181210
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20181203
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20181219
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20181218
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181231
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20181220
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20181120
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20190125
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:21.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: CEREVISANE - ROMEO ; NATIONAL REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 15726 N 20190222; FIRST REGISTRATION: FR 2170654 20171026
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:350097
Filing DATE:20190816
Expiry DATE:20261220
Extension DATE:20311220
 
Event date:27.09.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065 602006038167 DE
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: CEREVISANE; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 00A144-00 20190507; FIRST REGISTRATION: FRANKREICH 2170654 20171026
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122019000079
Filing DATE:20190917
Expiry DATE:20261222
 
Event date:07.11.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: CEREVISANE; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: ES-00519; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20190807; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): 2170654; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20171026
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C201930056
Effective DATE:20191001