Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1941012

EP1941012 - A PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF STEROLS AND OTHER COMPOUNDS FROM GLYCEROL OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM Nutritional Products AG
Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
[2014/28]
Former [2008/28]For all designated states
Ocean Nutrition Canada Limited
101 Research Drive Dartmouth
Nova Scotia B2Y 4T6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Weijie
583 Portland Hills Drive
Dartmouth, Nova Scotia B2W 6N9 / CA
 [2008/28]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/45]den Hartog, Jeroen H.J. , et al
Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Former [2012/43]Campbell, Neil Boyd
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/28]Campbell, Neil Boyd
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date06849452.525.08.2006
[2008/28]
WO2006IB04059
Priority number, dateUS20050712029P26.08.2005         Original published format: US 712029 P
[2008/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007088421
Date:09.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1941012
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007
[2008/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1941012
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA03.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:C11B3/10, A23D9/00, A23D9/02, A23L1/30, A61K31/202, A61P3/02, B01D15/08
[2008/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON STEROLEN UND ANDEREN VERBINDUNGEN AUS GLYCEROL-ÖLEN[2008/28]
English:A PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF STEROLS AND OTHER COMPOUNDS FROM GLYCEROL OILS[2008/28]
French:REDUCTION DE STEROLS ET AUTRES COMPOSES PROVENANT D'HUILES[2008/28]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2008National basic fee paid 
07.03.2008Search fee paid 
07.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/28]
10.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2012Fee for grant paid
29.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11162694.1  / EP2354213
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.07.2013   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  24.07.2013   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
30.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
05.04.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.04.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.06.2019Appeal received No.  T1781/19
16.08.2019Statement of grounds filed
02.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1768/15
02.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2017Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
08.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.08.2006
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
LU25.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2014/36]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/46]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
GR25.01.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003161918  (KENDRICK ANDREW [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,14,15,22,23,48,49,52 * claims 1-11 * [I] 50,51,53;
 [X]US5023100  (CHANG STEPHEN S [US], et al) [X] 22,23,48,49,52 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN1098874
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 22, Database accession no. 1997-236338, XP002579649 & CN1098874 A 19950222 (ZHAO Y) [X] 22,23,48-52 * abstract *
International search[X]CA2136018  (PQ CORP [US]);
 [X]US4681768  (MULFLUR W JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [X]US4349451  (FRIEDMAN BERNARD);
 [X]US4874629  (CHANG STEPHEN S [US], et al);
 [X]US5091117  (ATHNASIOS ALBERT K [US], et al);
 [X]US5128162  (WREZEL PAUL W [US], et al)