Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1941012 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1941012



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1189
09.01.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Claims Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Claims Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.01.2020 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
22.08.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.08.2019 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
16.08.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
26.06.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.06.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.06.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.06.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.04.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
05.04.2019 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
05.04.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
05.04.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Means of redress Opposition 2
05.04.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.04.2019 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.03.2019 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 19
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.03.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.03.2019 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.03.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
21.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 16
18.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 14
06.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 29
01.02.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.02.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.02.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.02.2019 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.02.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 8
24.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.01.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
18.01.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
16.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.01.2019 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.08.2018 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
18.07.2018 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.07.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.07.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.05.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 26
25.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.11.2017 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.11.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
13.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
05.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
05.10.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
21.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
13.09.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 9
11.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
07.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
01.09.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
29.08.2017 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
26.07.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
06.07.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
03.07.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.06.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.04.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
04.03.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
04.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 49
18.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
24.11.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.11.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.11.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
05.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
11.09.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.09.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.09.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
22.06.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
22.06.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
22.06.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.06.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.06.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.05.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 40
30.04.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
30.04.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
02.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.01.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.01.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
05.06.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
22.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.05.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 16
12.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Claims Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
10.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
07.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.03.2014 Claims Opposition 2
07.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
07.03.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
13.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.12.2013 Annex Opposition 1
24.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
08.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Annex Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
30.09.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
24.07.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.07.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 47
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
24.07.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.10.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.09.2012 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 2
11.09.2012 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
10.09.2012 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.04.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.03.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
29.03.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 3
13.02.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
13.02.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.02.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
10.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.12.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
10.12.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
10.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
31.05.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.05.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.05.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
12.05.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
07.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.09.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.04.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.04.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
11.03.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
07.03.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
07.03.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
07.03.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
11.01.2008 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
03.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.01.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
28.08.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 67
09.08.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 62