Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1968431

EP1968431 - COMBINED X-RAY AND OPTICAL TOMOGRAPHIC IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.11.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VisEn Medical, Inc.
940 Winter Street
Waltham MA 02451 / US
[N/P]
Former [2011/31]For all designated states
Visen Medical, Inc.
940 Winter Street
Waltham MA 02451 / US
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Visen Medical, Inc.
12B Cabot Road
Woburn, MA 01801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YARED, Wael, I.
22 Hastings Road
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Wilson, Justin Scott
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew
Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Application number, filing date06849995.321.12.2006
[2008/38]
WO2006US48785
Priority number, dateUS20050753590P22.12.2005         Original published format: US 753590 P
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007111669
Date:04.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1968431
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007
[2008/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1968431
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61B6/03, G06T11/00, G01N21/64
[2008/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTES RÖNTGEN- UND OPTISCHES TOMOGRAPHIE-BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM[2010/40]
English:COMBINED X-RAY AND OPTICAL TOMOGRAPHIC IMAGING SYSTEM[2008/38]
French:SYSTEME COMBINE D'IMAGERIE TOMOGRAPHIQUE A RAYONS X ET OPTIQUE[2010/40]
Former [2008/38]KOMBINIERTES RÖNTGEN- UND OPTISCHES TOMOGRAPHIE-DARSTELLUNGSSYSTEM
Former [2008/38]SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE TOMOGRAPHIQUE A RAYONS X ET OPTIQUE COMBINE
Entry into regional phase18.07.2008National basic fee paid 
18.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
25.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2011Fee for grant paid
28.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.12.2011  14.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives/SCANCO Medical AG
Bâtiment Le Ponant D, 25, rue Leblanc/Fabrikweg 2
FR-75015 Paris/CH-8306 Bruttisellen / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 [2016/36]
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  08.12.2011  14.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives/SCANCO Medical AG
Bâtiment Le Ponant D, 25, rue Leblanc/Fabrikweg 2
FR-75015 Paris/CH-8306 Bruttisellen / FR
Opponent's representative
Domenego, Bertrand, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
17.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.12.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2014
11.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1160/15
14.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200904   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
HU09.03.2011
IT09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
TR09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
[2018/17]
Former [2013/45]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
HU09.03.2011
IT09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
TR09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2013/44]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
IT09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
PL09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
TR09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
IE21.12.2011
LU21.12.2011
MC31.12.2011
Former [2012/10]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
DK09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
CZ09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
RO09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
SK09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
IS09.07.2011
PT11.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
EE09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
PT11.07.2011
Former [2011/41]AT09.03.2011
BE09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT09.03.2011
CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY09.03.2011
FI09.03.2011
LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
SI09.03.2011
BG09.06.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT09.03.2011
LV09.03.2011
SE09.03.2011
GR10.06.2011
ES20.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2004081865  (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]; WANG GE [US]; HOFFMAN ERIC [US]; MCLENNAN GE) [X] 1-7,13-15,17-20,25,26,28,38 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 25 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 26 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 15 * * page 14, line 7 - page 17, line 5 * * figure 1 * [Y] 8-12,16,21-24,29,31-37,39;
 [X]US5419320  (KAWAGUCHI FUMIO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,25-27,30 * column 2, line 26 - line 48 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]US5966422  (DAFNI EHUD [IL] ET AL) [Y] 29 * column 9, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *
 [DY]  - NTZIACHRISTOS V ET AL, "Experimental Fluorescence Tomography of Tissues With Noncontact Measurements", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200404), vol. 23, no. 4, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 492 - 500, XP011110227 [DY] 8-12,16,24,31-37 * page 492, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 493, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 493, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 494, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2004.825633
 [Y]  - BEUTHAN J, "Optical diagnostics - State of the art", MEDICAL LASER APPLICATION, ELSEVIER, NL, (20050608), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 1615-1615, pages 131 - 134, XP004905699 [Y] 21-23,39 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mla.2005.03.001