Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1971985

EP1971985 - ENERGY GENERATION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LV
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brillouin Energy Corp.
2625 Alcatraz Avenue No. 296 Berkeley
CA 94705 / US
[2009/28]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
Profusion Energy, Inc.
2700-B Lemoore Street
Alameda, California 94501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GODES, Robert, E.
2509 Prince Street
Berkeley, California 94705 / US
 [2008/39]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2018/39]
Former [2008/39]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date06851215.128.12.2006
[2009/12]
WO2006US62683
Priority number, dateUS20050755024P29.12.2005         Original published format: US 755024 P
[2008/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007130156
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1971985
Date:24.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2008/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1971985
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2016/04]
Former International [2008/39]G21B1/00, H05H1/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/39]
Former [2008/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENERGIEERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFARHEN[2008/39]
English:ENERGY GENERATION APPARATUS AND METHOD[2008/39]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE[2008/39]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2008National basic fee paid 
29.07.2008Search fee paid 
29.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/39]
01.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2018Fee for grant paid
14.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200803   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT26.09.2018
LV26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/11]LT26.09.2018
BG26.12.2018
GR27.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT26.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0645777  (CHIKUMA TOICHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-20 * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 26 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 34 * * column 9, line 10 - line 20 * * column 11, line 32 - line 57 * * figure _ *;
 [X]FR2708779  (ARNAUD GUY [FR]) [X] 1,4,7,12,13,16 * page 4, line 11 - line 33 * * page 6, line 17 - line 22 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 8 * * page 9, line 6 - line 15 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO03066516  (BLACKLIGHT POWER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,13-17,20 * page 56, line 20 - page 59, line 32 * * page 61, line 12 - page 63, line 7 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9013129  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,9,13,18 * page 13, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-2b,7a-8a *;
 [X]EP1551032  (OSAKA IND PROMOTION ORG [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9,13-18,20 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2004044923  (HAGELSTEIN PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5160695  (BUSSARD ROBERT W [US]);
 [Y]US6248221  (DAVIS RANDOLPH R [US], et al);
 [Y]US4871813  (SENEZ ALAIN [FR])
ExaminationWO9642085
by applicantEP0645777
 FR2708779
 WO03066516
 WO9013129
 EP1551032
 WO2004044923