Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1924545

EP1924545 - A PROCESS TO ENRICH A CARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GRUPO PETROTEMEX, S.A. DE C.V.
Ricardo Margain No. 444
Torre sur, Piso 16
Col. Valle de Campestre
San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon 66265 / MX
[2013/40]
Former [2011/36]For all designated states
Grupo Petrotemex, S.A. de C.V.
Ricardo Margain No. 444
Torre sur, Piso 16
Col. Valle del Campestre
66265 San Pedro Garza Garcia, Nuevo Leon / MX
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIBSON, Philip, Edward
2244 Charsley Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
02 / PARKER, Kenny, Randolph
599 Tyne Gray Road
Afton, TN 37616 / US
03 / O'MEADHRA, Ruairi, Seosamh
522 Willowbrook Trace
Kingsport, Tennessee 37660 / US
 [2008/22]
Representative(s)Tostmann, Holger Carl , et al
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Tostmann, Holger Carl , et al
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2008/22]Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06851350.618.05.2006
[2008/22]
WO2006US19329
Priority number, dateUS20050682767P19.05.2005         Original published format: US 682767 P
US2006036505501.03.2006         Original published format: US 365055
[2008/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008010785
Date:24.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1924545
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/42, C07C63/26
[2008/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANREICHERUNG EINER KARBONSÄUREVERBINDUNG[2008/22]
English:A PROCESS TO ENRICH A CARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOSITION[2008/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ENRICHISSEMENT D'UNE COMPOSITION D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE[2008/22]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2007National basic fee paid 
09.11.2007Search fee paid 
09.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/22]
03.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination11.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2246/16
05.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
10.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.11.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004052822  (EASTMAN CHEM COMPANY) [X] 1-41 * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 17, lines 5-9 *;
 [X]WO9730963  (IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC) [X] 1-41 * claims 1-10,23 *;
 [X]US4356319  (ROFFIA PAOLO ET AL) [X] 1-41 * columns 4-5; example 2 *;
 [X]US5359133  (NAZIMOK VLADIMIR FILIPPOVICH [RU] ET AL) [X] 1-41 * column 9, lines 13-25 *;
 [X]DE1242212  (STANDARD OIL CO) [X] 1-41 * examples 5,6 *;
 [X]US3170768  (BALDWIN RICHARD H) [X] 1-41 * column 3, lines 3-13 *