Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1968994 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1968994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 368
28.02.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 31
18.03.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
04.07.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
04.07.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
30.07.2008 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.08.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.09.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
09.10.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
14.11.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Annex Search / examination 7
23.12.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
23.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.01.2009 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
04.02.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
05.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.03.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
10.03.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.03.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
16.03.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.03.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
12.05.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.05.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
05.01.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 27
05.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Annex Search / examination 28
05.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
07.01.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
07.01.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
07.01.2010 Description Search / examination 8
07.01.2010 Description Search / examination 4
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 8
15.01.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
20.01.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.07.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.08.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
23.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.06.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
28.06.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
20.09.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.01.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.01.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
30.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Description Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
13.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1