blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1968994 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1968994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 368
08.05.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.07.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.05.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
13.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
13.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
30.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Description Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.10.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.03.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
26.01.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.09.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.06.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
28.06.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
21.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
23.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
23.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.12.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.08.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.07.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.01.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 8
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
07.01.2010 Description Search / examination 8
07.01.2010 Description Search / examination 4
07.01.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
07.01.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
07.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
05.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Annex Search / examination 28
05.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 27
05.01.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
22.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.05.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
27.03.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.03.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.03.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
11.03.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.03.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
10.03.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.03.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.02.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
13.01.2009 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
23.12.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
23.12.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
23.12.2008 Annex Search / examination 7
14.11.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
09.10.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
20.08.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2008 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
04.07.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.07.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
18.03.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
28.02.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 31