Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1968994


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
10.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
15.08.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
09.05.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
25.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
28.03.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
31.05.2013 (Expected) grant published on  03.07.2013  [2013/27]
24.05.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.05.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.10.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
11.06.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.01.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.06.2011 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.07.2011  [2011/30]
25.02.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.10.2010 Change - representative published on  03.11.2010  [2010/44]
03.09.2010 Change - representative published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]
10.08.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.07.2010 Change - inventor published on  01.09.2010  [2010/35]
27.01.2010 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.01.2010 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
22.01.2010 Change - applicant published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]
13.01.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2009 Change - inventor published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
06.10.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.06.2009 Change - inventor published on  08.07.2009  [2009/28]
05.06.2009 First examination report
04.06.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.05.2009 Change - representative published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
18.03.2009 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
17.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
11.03.2009 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.03.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.03.2009 Supplementary search report published on  08.04.2009  [2009/15]
06.03.2009 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.12.2008 Amendment by applicant
14.11.2008 Change - classification published on  17.12.2008  [2008/51]
14.11.2008 Change - classification published on  17.12.2008  [2008/51]
14.11.2008 Change - PCT data published on  17.12.2008  [2008/51]
17.10.2008 Change - PCT data published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
15.08.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
15.08.2008 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
12.08.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
02.04.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication