Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1968994

EP1968994 - SYNTHETIC GENOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU
published on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synthetic Genomics, Inc.
11149 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2010/08]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc.
9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VENTER, Craig, J.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc.
9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / SMITH, Hamilton, O.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc.
9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
03 / HUTCHISON, Clyde, A. III
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc.
9704, Medical Center Drive
Rockville
MD 20850 / US
04 / GIBSON, Daniel, G.
c/o J.Craig Venter Institute, Inc.
9704, Medical Center Drive
Rockville MD 20850 / US
 [2013/27]
Former [2010/35]01 / VENTER, Craig, J.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / SMITH, Hamilton, O.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
03 / HUTCHISON, Clyde, A. III
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704, Medical Center Drive Rockville
MD 20850 / US
04 / GIBSON, Daniel, G.
c/o J.Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704, Medical Center Drive
Rockville MD 20850 / US
Former [2009/46]01 / VENTER, Craig, J.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / SMITH, Hamilton, O.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
03 / HUTCHISON, Clyde, A. III
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704, Medical Centre Drive Rockville
MD 20850 / US
Former [2009/28]01 / VENTER, Craig, J.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / SMITH, Hamilton, O.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute, Inc. 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Former [2008/38]01 / VENTER, Craig, J.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / SMITH, Hamilton, O.
c/o J. Craig Venter Institute 9704 Medical Center Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Representative(s)Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/27]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2010/44]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2010/40]Lord, Hilton David , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2009/26]Irvine, Jonquil Claire , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2008/38]Roques, Sarah Elizabeth , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06851474.406.12.2006
[2008/38]
WO2006US46803
Priority number, dateUS20050742542P06.12.2005         Original published format: US 742542 P
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008024129
Date:28.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1968994
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008
[2008/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1968994
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/34, C12N15/64, C12N5/02, C12N5/04, C12N1/00, C07H21/04, C07H21/00
[2008/51]
Former International [2008/38]C07H21/04, C12N5/06, C12P1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYNTHETISCHE GENOME[2008/38]
English:SYNTHETIC GENOMES[2008/38]
French:GÉNOMES SYNTHÉTIQUES[2008/38]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2008National basic fee paid 
04.07.2008Search fee paid 
04.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/38]
23.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2013Fee for grant paid
16.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11170388.0   Application refused  : 01.12.2011
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2009
Opposition(s)04.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.01.2010Request for further processing filed
05.01.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.01.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2006
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
BG03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
TR03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
IE06.12.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
LU06.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
MC03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
LU06.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
IT03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
CZ03.07.2013
EE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
SK03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
RO03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
CY03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CY26.06.2013
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
LV03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
GR04.10.2013
ES14.10.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CY26.06.2013
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
FI03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
PL03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY26.06.2013
AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
IS03.11.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT03.07.2013
BE03.07.2013
LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT03.07.2013
SI03.07.2013
PT04.11.2013
Former [2013/49]SI03.07.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - TIAN J ET AL, "Accurate multiplex gene synthesis from programmable DNA microchips", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, UK, (20041223), vol. 432, no. 7020, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 1050 - 1054, XP002371017 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03151
 [Y]  - MARSHALL ELIOT, "Genetics. Venter gets down to life's basics.", SCIENCE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) 29 NOV 2002, (20021129), vol. 298, no. 5599, ISSN 1095-9203, page 1701, XP002516344 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.298.5599.1701
 [Y]  - PENNISI ELIZABETH, "Molecular biology. Venter cooks up a synthetic genome in record time.", SCIENCE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) 21 NOV 2003, (20031121), vol. 302, no. 5649, ISSN 1095-9203, page 1307, XP002516345 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.302.5649.1307a
 [PX]  - GLASS JOHN I ET AL, "ESSENTIAL GENES OF A MINIMAL BACTERIUM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20060101), vol. 103, no. 2, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 425 - 430, XP001248497 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0510013103
International search[X]US6521427  (EVANS GLEN A [US]);
 [Y]  - HUTCHISON C.A. ET AL., "Global Transposon Mutagenesis and a Minimal Mycoplasma Genome", SCIENCE, (19991210), vol. 286, pages 2165 - 2169, XP000865808

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.286.5447.2165
 [Y]  - SMITH H.O. ET AL., "Generating a synthetic genome by whole genome assembly: PhiX174 bacteriophage from synthetic oligonucleotides", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (20031223), vol. 100, no. 26, pages 15440 - 15445, XP002301506

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.2237126100
 [Y]  - CHECK E., "Venter aims for maximum impact with minimal genome", NATURE, (20021128), vol. 420, page 350, XP008128716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/420350b