Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1944700

EP1944700 - Method and system for real time interactive video [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imagetech Co., Ltd.
14F, No. 102 Kuang Fu S. Rd. 106 Taipei
T'ai pei / TW
[2008/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, San Wei
No. 256-2, Singdong Rd. Luodong Township
Yilan County 265 / TW
02 / Chen, Peng Wei
4F., No. 10, Alley 32 Lane 18, Hengke Rd. Sijhih City
Taipei County 221 / TW
03 / Lin, Chih-Mao
7F.-2, No. 1, Alley 1, Lane 133 Chenggong 1st Rd. Ren-ai District
Keelung City 200 / TW
04 / Weng, Chen-Hsiu
No. 34, Alley 11, Lane 297 Yuantong Rd. Jhonghe City
Taipei County 235 / TW
05 / Kuo, Yon-Fon
No. 33, Lane 175 Lyuchuan W. St. Central District
Taichung City 400 / TW
06 / Wang, Chuan-Hong
11F., No. 57, Shueiyuan Rd. Jhongjheng District
Taipei City 100 / TW
07 / Li, Tsai-Yen
3F., No. 10-1, Lane 2, Sec. 3 Jhihnan Rd. Wunshan District
Taipei City 116 / TW
08 / Liao, Wen-Hung
2F.-1, No. 1, Lane 118, Sec. 2 Siouming Rd. Wunshan District
Taipei City 116 / TW
 [2008/29]
Representative(s)Manasse, Uwe
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manasse, Uwe
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07000414.810.01.2007
[2008/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1944700
Date:16.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00
[2008/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/13]
Former [2008/29]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System für interaktives Echtzeitvideo[2008/29]
English:Method and system for real time interactive video[2008/29]
French:Procédé et système pour vidéo interactive en temps-réel[2008/29]
Examination procedure10.01.2007Examination requested  [2008/29]
28.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/27]
12.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9926198  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG]) [X] 1-19 * page 3, line 23 - page 23, line 29; figures 1-12; claims 1-38 *;
 [X]US2003032484  (OHSHIMA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004239670  (MARKS RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9965223  (THERMO INFORMATION SOLUTIONS I [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 1 - page 17, line 23; figures 1-7 *