Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1810756

EP1810756 - Apparatus for orienting magnetic flakes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Viavi Solutions Inc.
430 N. McCarthy Boulevard
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
JDS Uniphase Corporation
430 N. McCarthy Boulevard
Milpitas CA 95035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Raksha, Vladimir, P.
1692 Hopper Avenue
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
02 / Holman, Jay M.
2332 Sundance Street
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
03 / Coombs, Paul, G.
4733 Devonshire Place
Santa Rosa, California 95405 / US
04 / Markantes, Charles, T.
155 Stony Point Road, 21
Santa Rosa, California 95401 / US
05 / Phillips, Roger W.
466 Jacqueline Drive
Santa Rosa, California 95405 / US
 [2007/30]
Representative(s)Jones, Keith William , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2016/15]
Former [2007/30]Banzer, Hans-Jörg , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date07000773.716.01.2007
[2007/30]
Priority number, dateUS20060759356P17.01.2006         Original published format: US 759356 P
US2006055221924.10.2006         Original published format: US 552219
[2007/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1810756
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1810756
Date:24.10.2007
[2007/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1810756
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/14, B05D5/06
[2007/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/15]
Former [2007/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gerät für die Ausrichtung von Magnetspänen[2007/30]
English:Apparatus for orienting magnetic flakes[2007/30]
French:Appareil pour l'orientation des particles magnétiques[2015/15]
Former [2007/30]Appareil pour l'orientation des paillettes magnétiques
Examination procedure15.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/18]
08.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2016Fee for grant paid
17.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10011246.5  / EP2266710
EP16180975.1  / EP3133133
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2008
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
16.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
[2017/47]
Former [2017/37]EE13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
Former [2017/10]EE13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
Former [2016/51]LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004051297  (RAKSHA VLADIMIR P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14-22 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2006198998
 EP1493590
 US2004051297
 US6902807
 US2005037192
 US2006035080
 US2007115337