Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1847318

EP1847318 - Board materials provided with adsorbents for dry construction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2013
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.08.2013  [2013/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blücher GmbH
Mettmanner Strasse 25
40699 Erkrath / DE
[2007/43]
Inventor(s)01 / von Blücher, Hasso
Parkstrasse 10
40699 Erkrath / DE
 [2007/43]
Representative(s)Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Strasse 62
45130 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/03]Von Rohr
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rüttenscheider Strasse 62
45130 Essen / DE
Former [2007/43]Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date07003000.213.02.2007
[2007/43]
Priority number, dateDE2006101809718.04.2006         Original published format: DE102006018097
DE2006102217812.05.2006         Original published format: DE102006022178
[2007/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1847318
Date:24.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1847318
Date:20.07.2011
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/28, B01J20/20, B01D53/04, E04C2/04, A61L9/014
[2011/29]
Former International [2007/43]B01J20/28, B01J20/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/15]
Former [2012/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  LI 
Former [2007/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL28.06.2011
BA28.06.2011
HR28.06.2011
MK28.06.2011
RS28.06.2011
TitleGerman:Mit Adsorbentien beaufschlagte Plattenmaterialien für den Trockenbau[2007/43]
English:Board materials provided with adsorbents for dry construction[2007/43]
French:Plaques comportant des adsorbants pour la construction à sec[2007/43]
Examination procedure28.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/32]
23.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/34]
02.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.10.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19645193  (BLUECHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,14,16-18 * example 1; claims 1, 2, 5, 7 * [A] 4,5,8-10,12,13,15;
 [XAY]US2004101695  (ABE YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,14,16-18 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] * * examples 7-9; table 2 * [A] 4,5,8,9 [Y] 10,12,13,15;
 [X]US2004219845  (GRAHAM SAMUEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,14 * abstract * * figure 1; claims 1, 2 *;
 [X]DE69106840T  (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,14,17,18 * page 11 - page 13 *;
 [Y]DE19930732  (SANDLER HELMUT HELSA WERKE [DE]) [Y] 10,12,13,15 * examples 1-14 *