blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1887800

EP1887800 - Multimedia playback control apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2008/07]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Hyun Wook
No. 703-605, World Merdiang Seobyeon-dong
Buk-gu Daegu Metropolitan City / KR
02 / Park, Dae Gyue
No. 109-507, Donghwa Family Town Guaneum-dong
Buk-gu Daegu Metropolitan City / KR
 [2008/07]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2012/11]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Former [2008/33]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2008/07]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date07004013.427.02.2007
[2008/07]
Priority number, dateKR2006007595211.08.2006         Original published format: KR 20060075952
[2008/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1887800
Date:13.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1887800
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/173, H04N7/24
[2013/44]
CPC:
H04N7/17336 (EP,US); H04B1/40 (KR); H04N21/2387 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US); H04N21/47202 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2008/07]H04N7/173
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2014/19]
Former [2008/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Multimediawiedergabesteuerung[2008/07]
English:Multimedia playback control apparatus and method[2008/07]
French:Appareil et procédé de contrôle de lecture multimédia[2008/07]
Examination procedure27.02.2007Examination requested  [2008/07]
30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.05.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.06.2014Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
12.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/20]
19.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/20]
Appeal following examination24.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0198/16
24.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant deemed not to be filed
19.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5479303  (SUZUKI HIDEHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * columns 2-6 ** figures 3-6 *;
 [X]WO9957910  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-25 * pages 8-13; figure 4 * * abstract *;
 [X]WO0195624  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-25 * pages 11-19 * * figures 1,6,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.