Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1788399

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure08.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201006   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20070302
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1592131
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.09.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H03H 17/02 20060101AFI20070813BHEP
 
Event date:26.09.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 23/173 20060101ALI20070813BHEP
 
Event date:03.10.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:04.06.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080430
 
Event date:11.06.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:23.03.2011 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20101001
 
Event date:31.08.2007 
Event description:SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013
 
Event date:20.04.2007 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:09.09.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:18.02.2011 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN