Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1833237

EP1833237 - Retrieval of information embedded in an image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.2015  [2015/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2014/43]
Former [2007/37]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaguchi, Takashi
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Tokuda, Shinya
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2014/24]
Former [2007/37]01 / Yamaguchi, Takashi
c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Tokuda, Shinya
c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2007/37]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date07004514.106.03.2007
[2007/37]
Priority number, dateJP2006006063607.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006060636
[2007/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1833237
Date:12.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1833237
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1833237
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32, G06T1/00
[2009/09]
Former International [2007/37]H04N1/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2009/44]
Former [2007/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Extrahierung von in einem Bild eingebetteter Information[2007/37]
English:Retrieval of information embedded in an image[2007/37]
French:Extraction des informations incorporées dans une image[2007/37]
Examination procedure06.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
07.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2014Fee for grant paid
11.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2009
Opposition(s)23.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6763122  (RODRIGUEZ TONY [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * figure 9 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 3 * * column 7, lines 26-42 * * column 8, lines 2-5 *;
 [Y]WO2005059897  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 4, lines 13-17 * * page 11, lines 7-14 * * figure 6 *;
 [XY]EP1471722  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,11,12,17 * the whole document * [Y] 6,16;
 [Y]US2005134622  (YAMAGUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,6,13,16 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0069] - [0085] * * paragraphs [0172] , [0173] *;
 [Y]EP1385121  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 4-6,14-16 * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] * * paragraphs [0103] , [0104] *;
 [Y]US2004042636  (OH SANG-HEUN [KR]) [Y] 8-10,18-20 * abstract * * claim 3 *
 [Y]  XIAOQIANG LI ET AL, "Multi-channel data hiding scheme for color images", INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY: CODING AND COMPUTING [COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICAT IONS], 2003. PROCEEDINGS. ITCC 2003. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON APRIL 28-30, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030428), ISBN 978-0-7695-1916-6, pages 569 - 573, XP010638682 [Y] 8-10,18-20 * page 571 *
by applicantEP1471722
 US6763122
 US2005134622
 EP1385121
 WO2005059897
 US2004042636