Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1839901

EP1839901 - Pencil for the building industry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2011  [2011/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spagnolo, Adriano
Via Capovilla 7
36010 Rotzo VI / IT
[2007/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[2007/40]
Application number, filing date07004555.406.03.2007
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateIT2006VI0008629.03.2006         Original published format: IT VI20060086
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1839901
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
ClassificationInternational:B43K21/06
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bleistift für Bauindustrie[2007/40]
English:Pencil for the building industry[2007/40]
French:Crayon pour l'industrie de construction[2007/40]
Examination procedure01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/23]
12.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201105   M06   Not yet paid