EP1834540 - Electronically controlled system, with low energetic impact, for the contemporaneous drying and modelling of the hair, and related scheme for the construction, and ways of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gandolfo, Giovanni Via Dalmastro 9 12100 Cuneo / IT | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gandolfo, Giovanni Via Dalmastro 9 12100 Cuneo / IT | 02 /
Giraudo, Vittore Via del Passatore 224 Fraz. Passatore 12100 Cuneo / IT | [2012/04] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Gandolfo, Giovanni Via Dalmastro 9 12100 Cuneo / IT | ||
02 /
Giraudo, Vittore Via del Passatore 224 Fraz. Passatore 12100 Cuneo / IT | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 07004764.2 | 08.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | IT2006CN00004 | 17.03.2006 Original published format: IT CN20060004 | [2007/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834540 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1834540 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834540 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A45D4/10, A45D20/12, A45D20/44, A45D20/52, A45D44/00, A45D44/02, // A45D20/16 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A45D20/52 (EP);
A45D20/12 (EP);
A45D20/44 (EP);
A45D4/10 (EP);
A45D44/005 (EP);
A45D44/02 (EP);
A45D20/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Elektronisch gesteuertes System mit geringer energetischer Wirkung für das gleichzeitige Trocknen und Formen des Haars und dazugehöriges Bauschema und Benutzungsarten | [2007/38] | English: | Electronically controlled system, with low energetic impact, for the contemporaneous drying and modelling of the hair, and related scheme for the construction, and ways of use | [2007/38] | French: | Système commandé électroniquement, à faible impact énergétique, pour le séchage contemporain et le modelage des cheveux, et plan en relation avec la construction, et moyens d'utilisation | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2007 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | IE | 08.03.2012 | LU | 08.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
LU | 08.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3057364 (FREEDMAN LAWRENCE I, et al) [A] 16* the whole document *; | [Y]US3698402 (ARNESEN BERNHARD A) [Y] 11 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [Y]FR2215183 (CAMMAN MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 31 * page 2 - page 3; figure - *; | [Y]GB2082058 (SAHM JUERGEN) [Y] 14 * page 5 - page 6; figure - *; | [Y]US4376441 (DUNCAN THEODORE [US]) [Y] 33 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3319403 (POGETTI PIETRO) [Y] 17 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4676260 (PAULHUS DOROTHY A [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 2; figure - * [A] 12; | [Y]US5640781 (CARSON GARY PATRICK [US]) [Y] 22 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6052915 (TURNER CHERYL G [US]) [Y] 15 * column 4 - column 5; figure - *; | [XY]US2003234100 (ROSS SHERRY [US]) [X] 1-10,18-21,23-30,32,34,35 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0015] , [0022] , [0035] - [0069]; figure - * [Y] 11,13-15,17,22,31,33 |