Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1970211

EP1970211 - Secure identification document and method for producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto Oy
Turvalaaksonkaari 2
01740 Vantaa / FI
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Gemalto Oy
Turvalaaksonkaari 2
01741 Vantaa / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Kaskiala, Toni
c/o Setec Oy Suometsankaari 2
01740 Vantaa / FI
 [2008/38]
Representative(s)Fragnaud, Aude
Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Fragnaud, Aude
Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie
F-92190 Meudon Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07005017.412.03.2007
[2008/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1970211
Date:17.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10
[2008/38]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/21]
Former [2008/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sicheres Ausweisdokument und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2008/38]
English:Secure identification document and method for producing it[2008/38]
French:Document d'identification sécurisée et son procédé de fabrication[2008/38]
Examination procedure18.03.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/37]
23.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005087606  (MCCUMBER ROGER D [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,6,9;
 [X]CA2260551  (MARTIN DE BLOIS DESIGNER INC [CA]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9819870  (SETEC OY [FI]) [Y] 3,4,6,9 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2004105001  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5538773  (KONDO TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS6171487  (HOYA CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9409608U  (INGA WERBEMITTEL SPEZIALDRUCKE [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *