Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1808388

EP1808388 - Constant radius dock leveler hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rite-Hite Holding Corporation
8900 North Arbon Drive
Milwaukee, WI 53223-2451 / US
[2007/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Muhl, Timothy
1132 Nordic Lane
Slinger WI 53086 / US
02 / Jehn, Mike
S52 W23185 Amy Court
Waukesha WI 53189 / US
03 / Pietrangela, Pamela
621 East Derridge Pass
Oak Creek WI 53134 / US
04 / Mitchell, Michael
6903 W. Hadley Street
Milwaukee WI 53210 / US
05 / Tourdot, Matthew
W8105 Clover Valley Rd.
Whitewater WI 53190 / US
 [2007/29]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/29]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07005166.917.12.2004
[2007/29]
Priority number, dateUS2003073979118.12.2003         Original published format: US 739791
[2007/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1808388
Date:18.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1808388
Date:10.10.2007
[2007/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:B65G69/28
[2007/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2007/29]
TitleGerman:Ladebrückenscharnier mit konstantem Radius[2007/29]
English:Constant radius dock leveler hinge[2007/29]
French:Charnière de niveleur de quai à rayon constant[2007/29]
Examination procedure11.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
21.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/53]
06.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/53]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04029995.0  / EP1544139
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2843865  (MARTIN LOOMIS) [X] 1-16 * figure - *;
 [X]GB1048557  (ERNST WICHMANN, et al) [X] 1-16 * figure - *