EP1845024 - Compartment division arrangement for dividing the interior of a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BITO-Lagertechnik Bittmann GmbH Obertor 29 55590 Meisenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states BITO-Lagertechnik Bittmann GmbH Obertor 29 D-55590 Meisenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pick, Rolf Flurstrasse 9 55767 Hattgenstein / DE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Richardt, Markus Albert, et al Richardt Patentanwälte GbR ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Richardt, Markus Albert, et al Richardt Patents & Trademarks Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005699.9 | 20.03.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | DE20061017578 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006017578 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845024 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845024 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
B65D25/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | Fachteilereinrichtung zur Unterteilung des Innenraums eines Behälters | [2007/42] | English: | Compartment division arrangement for dividing the interior of a container | [2007/42] | French: | Dispositif de bras destiné à la division de l'espace intérieur d'un récipient | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | IE | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | MT | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | LU | 20.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
MT | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
IE | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1283923 (AUBERT M GERMAIN) [X] 1,2,4,8 * page 2, column 1; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,7; | [Y]EP0187201 (FAHRENBERGER APOTHEKENBAU [DE]) [Y] 5 * page 5 - page 6; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE4341596 (OTTO GEB KG [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 57; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5584412 (WANG CHU T [TW]) [X] 1,3,8,9 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 61; figures 1-8 *; | [XY]DE20008444U (LAUTENSCHLAEGER MEPLA WERKE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * pages 5-9; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,7; | [Y]DE20203792U (BRANGS & HEINRICH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7* figure 2 * |